Sisson v. Piedmont Regional Jail Authority et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Lynn Sisson
Defendant: Amy Baker, Amy Reid, Piedmont Regional Jail Authority, David Hicks, Mediko, Inc., Kaskha N. Johnson, Abraham Teklu, M.D., Nathaniel C Jones, Jr., Elizabeth A. Smith, Mediko, P.C. and James H. Davis
Case Number: 3:2019cv00602
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Traynham Anderson on behalf of James H. Davis, Piedmont Regional Jail Authority (Anderson, Matthew)
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by James H. Davis, Piedmont Regional Jail Authority.(Tunner, William)
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Saemi Murphy on behalf of Nathaniel C Jones, Jr (Murphy, Saemi)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the on Defendant Nathaniel C. Jones, Jr.'s ("Jones") Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Other Responsive Pleadings (the "Motion"), filed on September 24, 2019 #14 . Upon due consideration and agreement of counsel, the Motion is HEREBY GRANTED. It is HEREBY ORDERED that Jones has agreed to waive any claims of defective service upon him. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Jones has until November 1, 2019, to file a responsive pleading. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/24/19. (jsau, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Nathaniel C Jones, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Winneberger, Leslie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Kaskha N. Johnson, Mediko, Inc., Elizabeth A. Smith, Abraham Teklu, M.D..(Brewer, Taylor)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Victoria Lynn Sisson Nathaniel C Jones, Jr served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019 (Dix, Mark) Modified and corrected service date and answer deadline on 9/19/2019 (jsau, ).
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Amy Baker served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019; James H. Davis served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019; Kaskha N. Johnson served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019; Mediko, Inc. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019; Mediko, P.C. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019; Piedmont Regional Jail Authority served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019; Elizabeth A. Smith served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019; Abraham Teklu, M.D. served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(jsau, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald S. Culkin on behalf of Victoria Lynn Sisson (Culkin, Donald)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mediko, Inc.. (Brewer, Taylor)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Denslow Brewer on behalf of Kaskha N. Johnson, Mediko, Inc., Elizabeth A. Smith, Abraham Teklu, M.D. (Brewer, Taylor)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. It is hereby ADJUDGED, ORDERED, AND DECREED that the Complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Mediko, P.C., and Defendant Mediko, P.C. only, with all parties to bear their own attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses associated with any and all counts and claims as to Defendant Mediko, P.C. only. This matter shall continue as to the remaining Defendants. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/10/19. (jsau, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Mediko, P.C. by Victoria Lynn Sisson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissal of Mediko, P.C.)(Dix, Mark)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to David Hicks. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsau, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for David Hicks by Victoria Lynn Sisson. (Dix, Mark)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Amy Baker, James H. Davis, Kaskha N. Johnson, Nathaniel C Jones, Jr, Mediko, Inc., Mediko, P.C., Piedmont Regional Jail Authority, Elizabeth A. Smith, Abraham Teklu, M.D. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsau, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Victoria Lynn Sisson. (Dix, Mark)
August 19, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (jsau, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6795074.), filed by Victoria Lynn Sisson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Dix, Mark) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/19/2019) (jsau, ). (Redacted Attachment 2 replaced on 8/20/2019) (tjoh, ). (Attachment 8 replaced on 8/20/2019) (tjoh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sisson v. Piedmont Regional Jail Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piedmont Regional Jail Authority
Represented By: William Woodul Tunner
Represented By: Matthew Traynham Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediko, Inc.
Represented By: Taylor Denslow Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaskha N. Johnson
Represented By: Taylor Denslow Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Teklu, M.D.
Represented By: Taylor Denslow Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel C Jones, Jr.
Represented By: Leslie A. Winneberger
Represented By: Saemi Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A. Smith
Represented By: Taylor Denslow Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediko, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Davis
Represented By: William Woodul Tunner
Represented By: Matthew Traynham Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Lynn Sisson
Represented By: Mark Dennis Dix
Represented By: Matthew Ethan Bass
Represented By: Seth R Carroll
Represented By: Connor Scott Bleakley
Represented By: Seth Robert Lindberg
Represented By: Donald S. Culkin
Represented By: Peter Chapin Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?