Cole v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Dana Cole
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00622
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 Decline Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Wright, Gibson)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 Reply to #5 Order, Statement Regarding Consent filed by Dana Cole. (Yakubisin, Christopher)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Poole Yakubisin on behalf of Dana Cole (Yakubisin, Christopher)
September 26, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6100 before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (khan, )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that counsel shall confer with their respective clients and with each other to determine whether all parties will consent to assignment of the case to a Magistrate Judge as the presiding judicial officer. See 28 U.S.C. 636.1To that end, counsel for the defendant shall ensure that the foregoing conferences occur not later than October 11, 2019, and that the Court is informed not later than 5:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 9/26/19. (khan, )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 9/26/19. (khan, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/26/2019) (khan, ).
August 26, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsau, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust. (Wright, Gibson)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Wright, Gibson)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6804041.), filed by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Wright, Gibson) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/26/2019) (jsau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: Gibson Sinclair Wright
Represented By: Joseph Michael Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Gibson Sinclair Wright
Represented By: Joseph Michael Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Cole
Represented By: Jay Tronfeld
Represented By: Christopher Poole Yakubisin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?