Stirnweis v. Capital One Services, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Virginia Stirnweis
Defendant: Capital One, National Association, Capital One Services, LLC and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00637
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6100 before District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (khan, )
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that counsel shall confer with their respective clients and with each other to determine whether all parties will consent to assignment of the case to a Magistrate Judge as the presiding judicial officer. to that end, counsel for the defendant shall ensure that the foregoing conferences occur not later than November 8, 2019, and that the Court is informed not later than 5:00 p.m.. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/25/19. (khan, )
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/25/19. (khan, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Services, LLC, Capital One, National Association. (Satterwhite, Rodney)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Services, LLC, Capital One, National Association.(Satterwhite, Rodney)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Virginia Stirnweis Capital One Financial Corporation served 09/06/2019; answer due 09/27/2019. Capital One Services, LLC served 09/06/2019; answer due 09/27/2019. Capital One, National Association served 09/06/2019; answer due 09/27/2019. (Curwood, Craig) Modified on 9/20/2019 to add dates of service and answer due date. (tjoh, ).
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One Services, LLC, Capital One, National Association. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, )
September 3, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (tjoh, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Virginia Stirnweis. (Curwood, Craig)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6814210.), filed by Virginia Stirnweis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Curwood, Craig) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/3/2019) (tjoh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stirnweis v. Capital One Services, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Stirnweis
Represented By: Craig Juraj Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?