Wood v. USPS
Plaintiff: John Wood
Defendant: USPS
Case Number: 3:2019cv00641
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 39:409
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against USPS filed by John Wood. (jsmi, )
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis but DISMISSES Plaintiff's Complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is free to amplify the factual and legal bases upon which his claim rests and then refile with this Court. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status is hereby REVOKED for the purpose of appeal. Should Plaintiff wish to appeal this Order, written notice of appeal must be filed with the Clerk of Court within 30 days of the date of entry hereof. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/28/2019. Copy to pro se Plaintiff as directed. (jsmi, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Wood. (jsmi, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff's #1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is notified that, in order to successfully file his Complaint, a completed and signed copy of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Financial Affidavit, or in the alternative, payment of the Court's filing fee, is required before Plaintiff's Complaint can be docketed. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/2/2019. Copy to Plaintiff as directed with IFP form. (jsmi, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Wood. (Attachments: #1 Complaint (received)) (jsmi, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. USPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?