Edley-Worford v. Virginia Conference of the United Methodist Church
Plaintiff: Cheryl Edley-Worford
Defendant: Virginia Conference of the United Methodist Church
Case Number: 3:2019cv00647
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 Second MOTION to Dismiss filed by Virginia Conference of the United Methodist Church. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Brown, Steven)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 Second MOTION to Dismiss by Virginia Conference of the United Methodist Church. (Brown, Steven)
October 29, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge David J. Novak. District Judge Robert E. Payne no longer assigned to the case. (tjoh, )
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - In the interest of judicial efficiency and economy, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is reassigned to the Honorable David J. Novak. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/29/2019. (tjoh, )
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that the DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF No. 5) is denied without prejudice to the refiling of motions which separately analyzes whether the Court has subject matter jurisdiction at the beginning and whether the AMENDED COMPLAINT states a claim for relief within the meaning of Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) (6) and, if the defendant persists in asserting that summary judgment is appropriate under Fed. R, Civ. P. 56, a separate motion and memorandum shall be filed. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/17/2019. (tjoh, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, For Summary Judgment filed by Virginia Conference of the United Methodist Church. (Brown, Steven)
September 27, 2019 Notice of Correction re #9 Response. Clerk has corrected docket and replaced #8 Response in Opposition with corrected signature pages. Please disregard #9 Response which was filed incorrectly. (jsmi, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 DISREGARD FILING - FILED IN ERROR. Response to #8 Memorandum in Opposition, Amended Certificate of Service filed by Cheryl Edley-Worford. (Queen, Barbara) Modified on 9/27/2019 (jsmi, ).
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, For Summary Judgment filed by Cheryl Edley-Worford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Queen, Barbara) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/27/2019) (jsmi, ).
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Virginia Conference of the United Methodist Church.(Brown, Steven)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, For Summary Judgment filed by Virginia Conference of the United Methodist Church. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S)(Brown, Steven)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, For Summary Judgment by Virginia Conference of the United Methodist Church. (Brown, Steven)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Ann Strachan on behalf of Virginia Conference of the United Methodist Church (Strachan, Lindsey)
September 5, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (tjoh, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Virginia Conference of the United Methodist Church. (Brown, Steven) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/5/2019) (tjoh, ).
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Virginia Conference of the United Methodist Church. (Brown, Steven)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6821805.), filed by Virginia Conference of the United Methodist Church. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Brown, Steven) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/5/2019) (tjoh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edley-Worford v. Virginia Conference of the United Methodist Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Edley-Worford
Represented By: Barbara Allyn Queen
Represented By: Dominique LaRae Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Conference of the United Methodist Church
Represented By: Steven David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?