The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company v. Radack et al
Plaintiff: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: Trevor Fitzgibbon and Jesselyn Radack
Case Number: 3:2019cv00668
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 20 Memorandum in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Rollins, Lindsay)
November 7, 2019 Reset Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 10:15 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. (nbrow)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER. See for complete details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/01/2019. (Attachment: #1 Schedule A) (nbrow)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 11:15 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. See for complete details. Issued at the direction of the Court. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/01/2019. (nbrow)
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Jesselyn Radack.(Stewart, Dawn)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jesselyn Radack. (Stewart, Dawn)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jesselyn Radack. (Stewart, Dawn)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the CONSENT #12 MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT RADACK TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS is granted with modification. It is further ORDERED that the defendant, Jesselyn Radack, shall file her Answer and any other motions with respect to the Complaint by October 27, 2019. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/25/2019. (jsmi, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Margeaux Thomas on behalf of Jesselyn Radack (Thomas, D.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Jesselyn Radack. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stewart, Dawn)
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Trevor Fitzgibbon.(Biss, Steven)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company Trevor Fitzgibbon served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019 (Rollins, Lindsay)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company Jesselyn Radack served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019 (Rollins, Lindsay)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Trevor Fitzgibbon. (Biss, Steven)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Scott Biss on behalf of Trevor Fitzgibbon (Biss, Steven)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Becker Mumford, Jr on behalf of The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company (Mumford, John)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Trevor Fitzgibbon and Jesselyn Radack. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
September 16, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (jsmi, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Rollins, Lindsay)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Trevor Fitzgibbon by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Rollins, Lindsay)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Jesselyn Radack by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Rollins, Lindsay)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6838022.), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rollins, Lindsay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company v. Radack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: John Becker Mumford, Jr.
Represented By: Lindsay Lankford Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Fitzgibbon
Represented By: Steven Scott Biss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesselyn Radack
Represented By: Dawn Cheryl Stewart
Represented By: D. Margeaux Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?