Sammartino v. Knight
Plaintiff: Elizabeth R Sammartino
Defendant: Annelle P Knight
Case Number: 3:2019cv00695
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:19-cv-17706. Original file and docket sheet received.
September 23, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/24/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order transferring case to the Eastern District of Virginia;. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/20/2019. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/24/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff shall show cause by written submission on the docket within 10 days of the date of this order, why this case should not be transferred. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/9/2019. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/24/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANNELLE P KNIGHT. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/24/2019.]
September 6, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/24/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/24/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/24/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANNELLE P KNIGHT ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9945878) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ELIZABETH R SAMMARTINO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(GENTES, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/24/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sammartino v. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth R Sammartino
Represented By: Keith J. Gentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annelle P Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?