L.P.R. Construction Co. v. M. A. Mortenson Company et al
Plaintiff: L.P.R. Construction Co.
Defendant: M. A. Mortenson Company, Federal Insurance Company, RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00730
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3133
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by Federal Insurance Company, M. A. Mortenson Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Turner, Patricia)
November 27, 2019 Filing 24 COUNTERCLAIM against L.P.R. Construction Co., COUNTERCLAIM against L.P.R. Construction Co., filed by RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Turner, Patricia)
November 27, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC.(Turner, Patricia)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER (Granting Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel) - The parties consent to the withdrawal of Kyle R. Hosmer and the law firm of Faegre Baker Daniels LLP pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.1 (G), and the parties further consent to the substitution of William R. Mauck, Jr., Patricia Bugg Turner, and the law firm of Spotts Fain PC as counsel for Defendants M. A. Mortenson Company, Federal Insurance Company, and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 11/25/2019. (smej, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney --Consent Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel-- by Federal Insurance Company, M. A. Mortenson Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hosmer, Kyle)
October 30, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Hosmer, Kyle)
October 29, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Insurance Company. (Hosmer, Kyle)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - On the representations that the parties agree to the requested extension and that the extension will not cause undue delay, and finding good cause for the requested extension, the Motion #17 is hereby GRANTED. Defendants shall file their pleading or motion responding to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before Wednesday, November 27, 2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 10/29/2019. (smej, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Federal Insurance Company, M. A. Mortenson Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hosmer, Kyle)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by M. A. Mortenson Company. (Hosmer, Kyle)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Russell Hosmer on behalf of Federal Insurance Company, M. A. Mortenson Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Hosmer, Kyle)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER (Granting Extension of Time) - On the representation that the parties agree to the requested extension, that the extension will not cause undue delay, and finding good cause for the requested extension, the Motion #12 is hereby GRANTED. RAI shall file its pleadings responding to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before Wednesday, November 27, 2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 10/25/2019. (smej, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC. (Turner, Patricia)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting extension of time)(Turner, Patricia)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by L.P.R. Construction Co. Federal Insurance Company served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019; M. A. Mortenson Company served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019; RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 (tjoh, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul David Anders on behalf of L.P.R. Construction Co. (Anders, Paul)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Daniel Morris Gross to appear as Pro hac vice for L.P.R. Construction Co.. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 10/08/2019. (smej, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Morris Gross and Certification of Local Counsel Paul David Anders Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6872385. by L.P.R. Construction Co.. (Anders, Paul)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company, M. A. Mortenson Company, RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
October 4, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr.. (smej, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by L.P.R. Construction Co.. (Anders, Paul)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by L.P.R. Construction Co.. (Anders, Paul)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by L.P.R. Construction Co.. (Anders, Paul)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by L.P.R. Construction Co.. (Anders, Paul)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by L.P.R. Construction Co.. (Anders, Paul)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6871788), filed by L.P.R. Construction Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subcontract (Part 1), #2 Exhibit Subcontract (Part 2), #3 Exhibit Performance and Payment Bonds, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Anders, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.P.R. Construction Co. v. M. A. Mortenson Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. A. Mortenson Company
Represented By: Patricia Bugg Turner
Represented By: William Rutherford Mauck, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle Russell Hosmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Patricia Bugg Turner
Represented By: William Rutherford Mauck, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle Russell Hosmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC
Represented By: Patricia Bugg Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Patricia Bugg Turner
Represented By: William Rutherford Mauck, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle Russell Hosmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.P.R. Construction Co.
Represented By: Paul David Anders
Represented By: Daniel Morris Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?