Hall v. Anderson
Plaintiff: Tacitus Hall
Defendant: Timothy V. Anderson, James Mathers and William I. F. Collins
Case Number: 3:2019cv00749
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 Mail sent to Tacitus Hall returned as undeliverable. (jsmi, )
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on the plaintiffs updated amended complaint #7 and motion for a temporary restraining order and injunction to stop a non-judicial foreclosure action and eviction #8 . Because the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over this action, the Court DISMISSES the plaintiffs updated amended complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court lacks jurisdiction to rule on the motion for a temporary restraining order or injunction. Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to terminate the motion #8 . Plaintiff notified of right to appeal. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 11/19/19. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (jsau, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for TRO Injunction Opposing Wrongful Non-Judicial Foreclosure Action/Deed & Eviction/Action, by Tacitus Hall. (Attachments: #1 Rule 83.1(M) Certification (Typed))(jsau, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Updated AMENDED COMPLAINT against Timothy V. Anderson, William I. F. Collins, James Mathers, filed by Tacitus Hall. (Attachments: #1 Unmarked Attachment, #2 Rule 83.1(M) Certification (Typed))(jsau, )
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on the plaintiffs amended complaint #4 and motion for a temporary restraining order and injunction to stop a non-judicial foreclosure action #5 . Because the Court does not have subject matter jurisdiction over this action, the Court DISMISSES this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court lacks jurisdiction to rule on the motion for a temporary restraining order or injunction #5 . Plaintiff notified of right to appeal. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 11/15/19. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (jsau, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for TRO Injunction Opposing Wrongful Non-Judicial Foreclosure Action/Deed, by Tacitus Hall. (Attachments: #1 Rule 83.1(M) Certification)(jsau, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Timothy V. Anderson, William I. F. Collins, James Mathers, filed by Tacitus Hall. (Attachments: #1 Unmarked Attachment, #2 Typed Rule 83.1(M) Certification, #3 Rule 83.1(M) Certification)(jsau, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Timothy V. Anderson, filed by Tacitus Hall. #1 Unmarked Attachment) .jsau, )
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on the plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #1 . Upon due consideration, the Court FINDS the plaintiff unable to pay the costs of proceeding in this case. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the plaintiffs motion and DIRECTS the Clerk to docket the complaint. Further, for reasons stated herein, the Court DIRECTS the plaintiff to file an amended complaint within twenty-one (21) days of this Order. See Order for complete details. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 10/18/19. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (jsau, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tacitus Hall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Attachment)(jsau, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tacitus Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy V. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Mathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William I. F. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?