Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Bryant Thomas Heating And Cooling, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual FireInsurance Company and Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Bryant Thomas Heating And Cooling, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00780
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 9:05 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
November 19, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company Bryant Thomas Heating And Cooling, Inc. served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019 (Rosenblum, David)
November 19, 2019 Notice of Correction re #13 Affidavit of Service: Affidavit of Service was selected and Summons Returned Executed should have been selected. Clerk has notified filing attorney to refile the documents using the correct docket event. (smej, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 (DISREGARD). AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint upon Bryant Thomas Heating and Cooling, Inc., served on Bryant Thomas, R.A. on November 6, 2019, filed by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Rosenblum, David) Modified on 11/20/2019 (smej, ).
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Bryant Thomas Heating And Cooling, Inc.. (Hardt, Kenneth)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Bryant Thomas Heating And Cooling, Inc..(Hardt, Kenneth)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Erick Joel Kirker for Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/04/2019. (tjoh, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Erick J. Kirker and Certification of Local Counsel David Rosenblum Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6913578. by Nationwide Mutual FireInsurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Bryant Thomas Heating And Cooling, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS and print out two electronically reissued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Nationwide Mutual FireInsurance Company as to Bryant Thomas Heating And Cooling, Inc.. (Rosenblum, David)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint upon Bryant Thomas, Registered agent for Bryant Thomas Heating and Cooling,Inc. by Nationwide Mutual FireInsurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
October 23, 2019 Case transferred in from Alexandria Division (Case Number 1:19cv1328). (jtho, )
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that this case is hereby transferred to the Richmond Division of the Eastern District of Virginia to be properly filed and assigned to a judge in that division. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 10/21/2019. (spar)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bryant Thomas Heating And Cooling, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(spar)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual FireInsurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint upon Bryant Thomas, Registered Agent by Nationwide Mutual FireInsurance Company. (Rosenblum, David)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6893863.), filed by Nationwide Mutual FireInsurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenblum, David)
October 18, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (spar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Bryant Thomas Heating And Cooling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Thomas Heating And Cooling, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin V. Logan
Represented By: Kenneth Francis Hardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual FireInsurance Company
Represented By: David Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: David Rosenblum
Represented By: Erick Joel Kirker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?