Gray Manufacturing Company, Inc. v. Ashburn Volunteer Fire and Rescue Department
Plaintiff: Gray Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Defendant: Ashburn Volunteer Fire and Rescue Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00801
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:281
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Notice of Correction re #8 Affidavit of Service was selected and Summons Returned Executed should have been selected. Clerk has notified filing attorney to refile the documents using the correct docket event. (smej, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 (DISREGARD) - AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, Financial Interest Disclosure Statement, Civil Coversheet, Attachments, and Exhibits served on Loring Dixon on 12/18/2019, filed by Gray Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter Regarding Affidavit of Service)(Pandit, Siddhesh) Modified on 12/26/2019 (smej, ).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice. Michael Bryan Hurd appointed for Gray Manufacturing Company, Inc. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 11/22/2019. (jsmi, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Bryan Hurd and Certification of Local Counsel Siddhesh V. Pandit Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6946281. by Gray Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Pandit, Siddhesh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (jsmi, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ashburn Volunteer Fire and Rescue Department. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gray Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Pandit, Siddhesh) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/29/2019) (jsmi, ).
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Gray Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Pandit, Siddhesh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6911331.), filed by Gray Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Pandit, Siddhesh) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/29/2019) (jsmi, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray Manufacturing Company, Inc. v. Ashburn Volunteer Fire and Rescue Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashburn Volunteer Fire and Rescue Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gray Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Siddhesh Vishnu Pandit
Represented By: Michael Bryan Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?