Old v. Commonwealth of Virginia
Petitioner: Chemonz Valdez Olds
Respondent: Virginia Commonwealth of
Case Number: 3:2019cv00825
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Notification of transfer of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus from the Western District of VA Case No. 7:19cv734 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Western; Case Number 7:19-cv-00734. Original file and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #2 Prisoner Data Report) (ldab, ).
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order transferring case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 11/5/2019. (tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 11/6/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Chemonz Valdez Olds. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 11/6/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2254, filed by Chemonz Valdez Olds. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - H)(tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 11/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old v. Commonwealth of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chemonz Valdez Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Virginia Commonwealth of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?