Edmonds v. Abraham et al
Plaintiff: Andre Edmonds
Defendant: Officer FNU Abraham, Captain FNU Wyche, Lt. FNU Peterson and C. Desadier
Case Number: 3:2019cv00827
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - it is ORDERED that the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because Plaintiff failed to keep the Court informed of his current address. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 1/2/2020. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (tjoh, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 1/2/2020. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tjoh, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement from Riverside Regional Jail. (tjoh, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Andre Edmonds @ Riverside Regional Jail (tjoh, )
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER that this action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within 30 days of entry hereof; Clerk to obtain certified copy of Plaintiff's trust fund account for 6 month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; Plaintiff to return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days of entry hereof. See Order for details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 11/15/2019. Memorandum Order was mailed to plaintiff. (sbea, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre Edmonds. (tjoh, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Abraham, C. Desadier, FNU Peterson, FNU Wyche, filed by Andre Edmonds. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tjoh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edmonds v. Abraham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer FNU Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain FNU Wyche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. FNU Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Desadier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?