Johnson v. Penny Mac Loan Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Mark C. Johnson
Defendant: Penny Mac Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00837
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Penny Mac Loan Services, LLC. (Pickard, Adrien)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. For the reasons stated herein, the Court hereby ORDERS an evidentiary hearing to occur on April 2, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The Court will hear evidence from Petitioner, the purported arbitrator Kirk Gibbs (the "Arbitrator"), and Respondent. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS the Arbitrator to appear in person at the evidentiary hearing, both in his capacity as the arbitrator between the parties, and on behalf of SAA. Although Respondent has submitted evidence with its Motion to Vacate, not later than ten (10) days before the evidentiary hearing, Respondent may submit any further evidence that supports its Motion. Petitioner shall be responsible for serving a copy of this Order on the Arbitrator. Within seven (7) days of serving a copy of this Order on the Arbitrator, Petitioner shall file a certificate of service with the Court, confirming that he has served the Arbitrator. See Order for additional details. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 1/9/20. Clerk mailed copy to pro se petitioner as directed.(jsau, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 Cross MOTION to Vacate #1 Complaint filed by Penny Mac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Johnny Morton, #2 Exhibit B - Order in Meekins, #3 Exhibit C - Order in Kalmowitz)(Pickard, Adrien)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 Cross MOTION to Vacate #1 Complaint by Penny Mac Loan Services, LLC. (Pickard, Adrien)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 Opposition and ANSWER to #1 Complaint /Petition and Cross Motion to Vacate Fraudulent Arbitration Award by Penny Mac Loan Services, LLC.(Pickard, Adrien)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark C. Johnson Penny Mac Loan Services, LLC served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020 (tjoh, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 Documents received by Mark C. Johnson. (tjoh, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Penny Mac Loan Services, LLC. (Clerk to notify plaintiff that summons is ready). (tjoh, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award against Penny Mac Loan Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 34683045481.), filed by Mark C. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Final Arbitration Award, #2 Receipt, #3 Attachment)(tjoh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Penny Mac Loan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Mac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Adrien Caulder Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?