Muse v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Angelo R. Muse
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00853
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 Marshal's Executed Return on Summonses issued to Nancy A. Berryhill, Commissioner of Social Security and U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia. (walk, ). Clerk replaced document to include Returned Summons on 1/3/2020. Modified docket text on 1/3/2020 (sbea, ).
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 7/20/2018. (sbea, )
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REVISED STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 10/17/2013. (sbea, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate Reporting Service; Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/11/2019, answer is due on 2/10/2020. (sbea, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, Commissioner of Social Security, United States Attorney General and U.S. Attorney for EDVA; forwarded to USMS with USM-285 forms. (walk, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed by Angelo R. Muse against Commissioner of Social Security; filed re: #3 Order. (walk, )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that upon due consideration, Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #1 ) filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) on November 18, 2019, is GRANTED. Plaintiff may proceed in this case without paying the Court's filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue process and deliver the summons to the United States Marshal for service. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 12/03/2019. (walk, )
November 19, 2019 Notice of Correction re: Document #1 ; the filing user is requested to pay the required $400.00 filing fee, using the filing event, Electronic Fee Payment - 400.00 Fee or, file the Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees (the Long Form, which is available on the Court's website), using the filing event, Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The filing user is also notified that USM-285 forms should always be included as attachments the proposed summonses instead of the civil complaint. (walk, )
November 18, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (sbea, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Angelo R. Muse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons - US Attorney, #2 Exhibit Summons - Regional Counsel)(Farrell, Clifford) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2019: #3 USM-285 (Social Security Administration), #4 USM-285 (U.S. Attorney General), #5 USM-285 (U.S. Attorney's Office). (walk, ). Corrected docket entry on 11/22/2019. (walk, ).
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Angelo R. Muse. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and #2 Civil Complaint. (Farrell, Clifford). Corrected docket entry on 11/22/2019 and regenerated NEF. (walk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muse v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo R. Muse
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Lucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?