Patel v. POLITICO LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kashyap Patel and Kash
Defendant: Natasha Bertrand, POLITICO LLC, Robert Allbritton and Robert L. Allbritton
Case Number: 3:2019cv00879
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE Consenting to Motion re: #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Robert L. Allbritton, Natasha Bertrand, POLITICO LLC. (Kelley, Matthew) Modified docket text on 12/11/2019 (jsau, ).
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kashyap Patel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Biss, Steven) Modified docket text on 11/27/2019 (jsau, ).
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kashyap Patel. (Biss, Steven) Modified docket text on 11/27/2019 (jsau, ).
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Kashyap Patel. (Biss, Steven)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Scott Biss on behalf of Kashyap Patel (Biss, Steven)
November 27, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsau, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by POLITICO LLC. (Kelley, Matthew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6959281.), filed by Robert Allbritton, Natasha Bertrand, POLITICO LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint and Summonses, #2 Exhibit 2 Liu Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. POLITICO LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha Bertrand
Represented By: Matthew Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLITICO LLC
Represented By: Matthew Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Allbritton
Represented By: Matthew Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Allbritton
Represented By: Matthew Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kashyap Patel
Represented By: Steven Scott Biss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kash
Represented By: Steven Scott Biss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?