Dyson v. Henrico County School Board
Plaintiff: Kyle B. Dyson, Sr.
Defendant: Henrico County School Board
Case Number: 3:2019cv00893
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINAL ORDER that this matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice #10 . It is HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/15/20. (jtho, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal per FRCP 41 by Kyle B. Dyson, Sr (Brown, Christopher)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 9:05 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Mary Letendre on behalf of Henrico County School Board (Letendre, Denise)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Henrico County School Board. (McChesney, John)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Henrico County School Board. (McChesney, John)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 (Original) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle B. Dyson, Sr. (Please also see Document #4 ). (Brown, Christopher). Modified docket entry on 12/17/2019. (walk, ).
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle B. Dyson, Sr Henrico County School Board served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 (Brown, Christopher)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Henrico County School Board. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ask your process server to return the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (walk, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Kyle B. Dyson, Sr. (Brown, Christopher)
December 3, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (sbea, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6966851), filed by Kyle B. Dyson, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A, #3 Exhibit Ex B)(Brown, Christopher). Modified docket text on 12/4/2019 (sbea, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dyson v. Henrico County School Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henrico County School Board
Represented By: Denise Mary Letendre
Represented By: John David McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle B. Dyson, Sr.
Represented By: Christopher E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?