Donegal Mutual Insurance Company v. Envirowash of Virginia Beach, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donegal Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Sandhu Management & Investments, L.L.C., Custom Cleaning Services, LLC, Envirowash of Virginia Beach, LLC, ERPS Enterprises, Inc. and Envirowash, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00901
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT in response to January 29, 2020 Order (Dkt. 20) by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Streit, Kevin)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that, on February 10, 2020, this action will be dismissed against the defendants, Sandhu Management & Investments, LLC and Custom Cleaning Services, LLC, unless before that date the plaintiff acts to advance the case with respect to those defendants. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/29/2020. (jsmi, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Walter Lehr on behalf of Donegal Mutual Insurance Company (Lehr, Michael)
January 28, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Custom Cleaning Services, LLC, ERPS Enterprises, Inc., Sandhu Management & Investments, L.L.C., Envirowash, LLC, filed by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Streit, Kevin)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that #15 CONSENT MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF DONEGAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S TIME IN WHICH TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AS A MATTER OF COURSE is granted. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff shall file its Amended Complaint by February 14, 2020; and defendants, Envirowash of Virginia Beach, LLC, ERPS Enterprises, Inc., and Sandhu Management & Investments, LLC, shall file their Answers and any other motions with respect to the Amended Complaint by February 28, 2020. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/15/2020. (jsmi, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint, as a Matter of Course filed by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Streit, Kevin)
January 14, 2020 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint, as a Matter of Course by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Streit, Kevin)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that #12 JOINT MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT SANDHU MANAGEMENT & INVESTMENTS, L.L.C. AND TO ENLARGE TIME FOR FILING OF RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS is granted. It is further ORDERED that #10 ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed on January 7, 2020 with respect to the defendant, Sandhu Management & Investments, L.L.C., is VACATED; and the defendant, Sandhu Management & Investments, L.L.C., shall file its Answer and any other motions with respect to the Complaint by February 7, 2020. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/10/2020. (jsmi, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 Joint MOTION to Vacate #10 Clerk's Entry of Default and Enlarge Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Sandhu Management & Investments, L.L.C.. (Frye, Charles)
January 8, 2020 Notice of Correction re #12 Joint MOTION to Vacate #10 Clerk's Entry of Default and Enlarge Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Filing attorney notified to file Memorandum in Support of #12 Motion as a separate pleading. (jsmi, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Vacate #10 Clerk's Entry of Default and Enlarge Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Sandhu Management & Investments, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Frye, Charles)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Custom Cleaning Services, LLC. (jsmi, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 VACATED PER #14 ORDER ENTERED ON 1/10/2020 - Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sandhu Management & Investments, L.L.C. (jsmi, ) Modified on 1/29/2020 (jsmi, ).
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Entry of Default as to Custom Cleaning Services, LLC by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kevin T. Streit)(Streit, Kevin)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Entry of Default as to Sandhu Management & Investments, L.L.C. by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kevin T. Streit)(Streit, Kevin)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by ERPS Enterprises, Inc..(Byrne, Anne)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Envirowash of Virginia Beach, LLC.(Byrne, Anne)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company Custom Cleaning Services, LLC served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020; ERPS Enterprises, Inc. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; Envirowash of Virginia Beach, LLC served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019; Sandhu Management & Investments, L.L.C. served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019 (Streit, Kevin)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
December 5, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (jsmi, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Streit, Kevin)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, as to Defendants Envirowash of Virginia Beach, LLC, ERPS Enterprises, Inc., Sandhu Management & Investments, L.L.C., and Custom Cleaning Services, LLC by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Streit, Kevin)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6968717.), filed by Donegal Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Streit, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donegal Mutual Insurance Company v. Envirowash of Virginia Beach, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandhu Management & Investments, L.L.C.
Represented By: Charles Clinton Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom Cleaning Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envirowash of Virginia Beach, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERPS Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Catherine Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envirowash, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donegal Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Streit
Represented By: Michael Walter Lehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?