Moss v. Apex Systems, LLC
Plaintiff: Andre Moss
Defendant: Apex Systems, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00102
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 So Ordered Notice of Rule 41 Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to Rule41(a)(1)(A)(i), Andre Moss dismisses this case. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 2/19/2020. (sbea, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andre Moss (Antell, Zev)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Apex Systems, LLC. **NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ask your process server to return the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (sbea, )
February 17, 2020 Notice of Correction re: #1 Original Complaint; Clerk notified filing attorney of proper filing procedures for submitting the Complaint. Clerk included the Civil Action Number on the Original Complaint and also included the "Party Text". No further action is required. (sbea, )
February 17, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (sbea, )
February 17, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Andre Moss. (Antell, Zev)
February 17, 2020 Filing 1 Original Complaint (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-7076975), filed by Andre Moss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Andre Moss, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Antell, Zev). Clerk replaced Complaint to include Civil Action Number on 2/18/2020. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 2/18/2020 (sbea, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. Apex Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Moss
Represented By: Zev Hillel Antell
Represented By: Harris Dewey Butler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?