Wallace v. C.R. England, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sinath Sot Wallace
Defendant: John Doe, C.R. England, Inc. and Khalil Amin Graves
Case Number: 3:2020cv00243
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 09:20 AM before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr.. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 5/22/20. (Attachment: #1 Electronic Device Authorization form for counsel not listed on order)(wtuc) Modified on 5/22/2020 to correct date for pretrial (wtuc).
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by C.R. England, Inc. and Khalil Amin Graves(Winsky, Ashley) Modified on 5/21/2020 to add name of second defendant (wtuc).
May 5, 2020 Notice of Correction re #7 Waiver of Service Executed, #6 Waiver of Service Executed: Clerk notified the filing attorney that the dates used when filing the waivers were incorrect. The correct sent date is 4/06/2020, making the answer deadline 06/05/2020. The Clerk will reset the answer deadline and correct the docket entry. (smej, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by C.R. England, Inc.. (Winsky, Ashley)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by C.R. England, Inc.. C.R. England, Inc. waiver sent on 4/6/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Winsky, Ashley) Modified to correct answer deadline on 5/5/2020 (smej, ).
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Khalil Amin Graves. Khalil Amin Graves waiver sent on 4/6/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Winsky, Ashley) Modified to correct answer deadline on 5/5/2020 (smej, ).
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Khalil Amin Graves on 04/06/2020 by Sinath Sot Wallace. Waiver of Service due by 5/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Waiver of Summons)(Rabkin, Ilya)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to C.R. England, Inc. on 04/06/2020 by Sinath Sot Wallace. Waiver of Service due by 5/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Waiver of Summons)(Rabkin, Ilya)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Khalil Amin Graves on 04/06/2020 by Sinath Sot Wallace. Waiver of Service due by 5/6/2020. (Rabkin, Ilya)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to C.R. England, Inc. on 04/06/2020 by Sinath Sot Wallace. Waiver of Service due by 5/6/2020. (Rabkin, Ilya)
April 6, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (tjoh, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Sinath Sot Wallace. (Filing Fee paid receipt #0422-7148999) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt Receipt for filing fee)(Rabkin, Ilya) Modified on 4/6/2020 to add receipt number (tjoh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. C.R. England, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sinath Sot Wallace
Represented By: Ilya Rabkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Walker Winsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khalil Amin Graves
Represented By: Ashley Walker Winsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?