Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company v. Connection Auto Sales, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Larry Smith, Antonio Mendoza and Connection Auto Sales, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00275
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2020 at 10:15 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Order issued by deputy clerk at the direction of the Court) (rpiz)
June 4, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Larry Smith served on 4/23/2020, answer due 5/14/2020 (Casey, Brian) Modified on 6/5/2020 (smej, ).
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Antonio Mendoza served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020 (Casey, Brian) Modified on 6/5/2020 (smej, ).
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Connection Auto Sales, Inc. served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020 (Casey, Brian) Modified on 6/5/2020 (smej, ).
May 28, 2020 Notice of Correction re #8 Affidavit of Service, #9 Affidavit of Service: Affidavit of Service was selected and Summons Returned Executed should have been selected. Filing attorney has been instructed to refile the document using the correct docket event. (smej, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Antonio Mendoza on 4/29/2020, filed by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Casey, Brian)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Connection Auto Sales, Inc., Mike Puckett on 4/22/2020, filed by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Casey, Brian)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Larry Smith.(Newby, John)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Connection Auto Sales, Inc., Antonio Mendoza, Larry Smith. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to be served on Larry Smith by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Casey, Brian)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to be served on Antonio Mendoza by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Casey, Brian)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for service on Connection Auto Sales by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Casey, Brian)
April 16, 2020 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint: Filing attorney has been instructed to file proposed summons to serve defendants, or if waiving service, to notify the court in writing by electronically filing the notice. (smej, )
April 16, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (smej, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Casey, Brian)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-7163602), filed by Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)( Casey, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company v. Connection Auto Sales, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Smith
Represented By: John Ray Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connection Auto Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian Nelson Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?