Rush Hour Live Escape Games LLC v. Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Rush Hour Live Escape Games LLC
Defendant: Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00323
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Rush Hour Live Escape Games LLC (Sheldon, Justin)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion by Rush Hour Live Escape Games LLC for the Admission of Daniel B. Levin, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 05/19/2020. (walk, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Levin and Certification of Local Counsel Justin M. Sheldon Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7206681. by Rush Hour Live Escape Games LLC. (Sheldon, Justin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
May 6, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (smej, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Rush Hour Live Escape Games LLC. (Sheldon, Justin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-7191889), filed by Rush Hour Live Escape Games LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sheldon, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rush Hour Live Escape Games LLC v. Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rush Hour Live Escape Games LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Arnold Breit
Represented By: Kevin Biniazan
Represented By: Justin Matthew Sheldon
Represented By: Daniel Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?