L & L Logistics and Warehousing Inc. dba L & L Trucking
Plaintiff: L & L Logistics and Warehousing, Inc.
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company and Markel Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00324
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Plaintiff's #13 Amended Complaint) by Evanston Insurance Company, Markel Corporation.(Mumford, John)
July 1, 2020 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Evanston Insurance Company, Markel Corporation. (Mumford, John)
July 1, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Evanston Insurance Company, Markel Corporation. (Mumford, John)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B), the plaintiff filed a FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT on June 18, 2020 (ECF No. #13 ), it is hereby ORDERED that DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF No. #8 ) is denied as moot. It is further ORDERED that the defendants shall file their Answers and any other motions with respect to the FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by July 1, 2020. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 6/22/2020. (sbea,)
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Counterclaim re #11 Counterclaim, by L & L Logistics and Warehousing, Inc.. (Sheldon, Justin)
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Evanston Insurance Company, Markel Corporation, filed by L & L Logistics and Warehousing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sheldon, Justin)
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Lankford Rollins on behalf of Evanston Insurance Company, Markel Corporation (Rollins, Lindsay)
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment against L & L Logistics and Warehousing, Inc. filed by Evanston Insurance Company.(Mumford, John). Modified docket entry on 06/05/2020. (walk, ).
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Evanston Insurance Company, Markel Corporation. (Mumford, John)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Evanston Insurance Company, Markel Corporation. (Mumford, John)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Evanston Insurance Company, Markel Corporation. (Mumford, John)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by L & L Logistics and Warehousing, Inc.. (Sheldon, Justin)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion by L & L Logistics and Warehousing, Inc. for the Admission of Daniel Levin, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 05/26/2020. (walk, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Levin and Certification of Local Counsel Justin M. Sheldon Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7206703. by L & L Logistics and Warehousing, Inc.. (Sheldon, Justin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Evanston Insurance Company, Markel Corporation. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsau, )
May 6, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (jsau, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Markel Corporation by L & L Logistics and Warehousing Inc. dba L & L Trucking. (Sheldon, Justin) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/6/2020) (jsau, ).
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Evanston Insurance Company by L & L Logistics and Warehousing Inc. dba L & L Trucking. (Sheldon, Justin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7192014.), filed by L & L Logistics and Warehousing Inc. dba L & L Trucking. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sheldon, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L & L Logistics and Warehousing Inc. dba L & L Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L & L Logistics and Warehousing, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Arnold Breit
Represented By: Kevin Biniazan
Represented By: Justin Matthew Sheldon
Represented By: Daniel Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: John Becker Mumford, Jr.
Represented By: Lindsay Lankford Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markel Corporation
Represented By: John Becker Mumford, Jr.
Represented By: Lindsay Lankford Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?