Montgomery v. Virginia Department of Social Services
Plaintiff: Carlos Antonio Montgomery
Defendant: Virginia Department of Social Services and Division of Child Support Enforcement
Case Number: 3:2020cv00399
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 5:20-cv-00232. Original file and docket sheet received.
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER: 1. The Clerk of the Court shall TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia, Richmond Division, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), 1406(a). 2. All pending motions are DEFERRED for resolution by the transferee court. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/4/20.(JLM)cc: COR and Carlos Antonio Montgomery by US mail (JLM). [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 6/5/2020.]
June 1, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlos Antonio Montgomery (KM) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 6/5/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell.(KM)cc: COR and Carlos Montgomery by US Mail [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 6/5/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(KM) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 6/5/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlos Antonio Montgomery, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (KM) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 6/5/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Conflict Check run. (KM) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 6/5/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED), filed by Carlos Antonio Montgomery, pro se.(KM) [Transferred from Kentucky Eastern on 6/5/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. Virginia Department of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Department of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division of Child Support Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Antonio Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?