Alexander v. Saul
Plaintiff: Anthony D Alexander
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00417
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 07/20/2018. (tjoh, )
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REVISED STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 10/17/2013. (tjoh, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Certificate Reporting Service by Andrew M. Saul, SSA (Social Security Administration). Andrew M. Saul served on 7/27/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Lucier, Jonathan)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tyler Lucier on behalf of SSA (Social Security Administration), Andrew M. Saul (Lucier, Jonathan)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER - Effective immediately, if all parties in a Social Security Appeal consent to have the matter heard by a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), the matter shall be reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes for all purposes. If the parties do not consent to have the matter heard by a United States Magistrate Judge, the case shall be referred to Judge Hanes for Report and Recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 06/19/2020. (tjoh, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, )
June 10, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge David J. Novak. (tjoh, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for service upon Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of SSA, William Barr, U.S. Attorney General and G. Zachary Terwilliger, U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia by Anthony D Alexander. (Billman, Bruce)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for Judicial Review ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7240657.), filed by Anthony D Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Billman, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony D Alexander
Represented By: Bruce Knight Billman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?