Lewis v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Carla T. Lewis
Defendant: Virginia Property Insurance and Roy Smith
Case Number: 3:2020cv00546
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Roy Smith, Virginia Property Insurance, filed by Carla T. Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachments, #3 Rule 83.1)(tjoh, )
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The Court FINDS Lewis unable to pay the costs of proceeding in this case. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Lewiss motion and DIRECTS the Clerk to docket the complaint. It is further ORDERED that, no later than September 4, 2020, Lewis SHALL file an Amended Complaint. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 08/04/2020. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff. (tjoh, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal received from Carla T. Lewis. (jsmi, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carla T. Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Complaint/Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment, #4 Local Rule 83.1)(tjoh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Property Insurance
Represented By: Gary Robert Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Smith
Represented By: Gary Robert Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla T. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?