Thweatt v. Rhodes et al
Plaintiff: Addie E. Thweatt
Defendant: Alvin F. Jones and Ronald T. Rhodes
Case Number: 3:2020cv00548
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 9:45 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
September 3, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ronald T. Rhodes. (York, Melissa)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Addie E. Thweatt. (Thorsen, James)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that Rhodes's #11 Motion to File Under Seal the bus film of the Prince George County School Board is GRANTED. The Clerk shall immediately and permanently seal the bus film of the Prince George County School Board. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 8/20/2020. (jsmi, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Micaylee Alexa Noreen on behalf of Alvin F. Jones (Noreen, Micaylee)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Ronald T. Rhodes re #12 Brief in Support, #11 MOTION to Seal (York, Melissa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 Brief in Support to #11 MOTION to Seal filed by Ronald T. Rhodes. (York, Melissa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Seal by Ronald T. Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(York, Melissa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 Brief in Support to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ronald T. Rhodes. (York, Melissa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ronald T. Rhodes. (York, Melissa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant Alvin E. Jones' ANSWER to Complaint by Alvin F. Jones.(Sparks, Randy)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that #6 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant Jones has until August 17, 2020, to file a responsive pleading. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 8/10/2020. (jsmi, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint by Alvin F. Jones. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Sparks, Randy). Modified docket text on 8/6/2020. (sbea,)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER- THIS MATTER is before the Court on Defendant Ronald T. Rhodes's Consent Motion for an Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleadings (the "Motion"), filed on August 3, 2020 (ECF No. 4). Defendant Rhodes requests an extension of time until August 17, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiff consents to the Motion. Upon due consideration and agreement of counsel, the Motion is HEREBY GRANTED. Defendant Rhodes has until August 17, 2020, to file a responsive pleading. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 08/03/2020. (tjoh, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Ronald T. Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order)(York, Melissa)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alvin F. Jones and Ronald T. Rhodes. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (jsmi, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Addie E. Thweatt. (Thorsen, James)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7304928.), filed by Addie E. Thweatt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Thorsen, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thweatt v. Rhodes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin F. Jones
Represented By: Micaylee Alexa Noreen
Represented By: Randy Carl Sparks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald T. Rhodes
Represented By: Melissa Yvonne York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Addie E. Thweatt
Represented By: James Broome Thorsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?