Bauer-Robertson et al v. Shiva Finance, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Renee Galloway, Lloyd Ryan, Craig Miller, Melissa Smith, James Johnson, Donnie Southers, Jimmy Tuprin, Brenard Reel, Patrick Selig, Deborah Bauer-Robertson, Constance Hollands, Vtessa Watson, Melody Mobley, Veda Johnson and Tynisa Richardson
Defendant: Harpeth Financial Services, LLC and Shiva Finance, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00551
Filed: July 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Carley Marchiando on behalf of Deborah Bauer-Robertson, Renee Galloway, Constance Hollands, James Johnson, Veda Johnson, Craig Miller, Melody Mobley, Brenard Reel, Tynisa Richardson, Lloyd Ryan, Patrick Selig, Melissa Smith, Donnie Southers, Jimmy Tuprin, Vtessa Watson (Marchiando, Craig)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale Wood Pittman on behalf of Deborah Bauer-Robertson, Renee Galloway, Constance Hollands, James Johnson, Veda Johnson, Craig Miller, Melody Mobley, Brenard Reel, Tynisa Richardson, Lloyd Ryan, Patrick Selig, Melissa Smith, Donnie Southers, Jimmy Tuprin, Vtessa Watson (Pittman, Dale)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Christopher Litman on behalf of Deborah Bauer-Robertson, Renee Galloway, Constance Hollands, James Johnson, Veda Johnson, Craig Miller, Melody Mobley, Brenard Reel, Tynisa Richardson, Lloyd Ryan, Patrick Selig, Melissa Smith, Donnie Southers, Jimmy Tuprin, Vtessa Watson (Litman, Michael)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Leigh Austin on behalf of Deborah Bauer-Robertson, Renee Galloway, Constance Hollands, James Johnson, Veda Johnson, Craig Miller, Melody Mobley, Brenard Reel, Tynisa Richardson, Lloyd Ryan, Patrick Selig, Melissa Smith, Donnie Southers, Jimmy Tuprin, Vtessa Watson (Austin, Amy)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Harpeth Financial Services, LLC, Shiva Finance, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Harpeth Financial Services, LLC. by Deborah Bauer-Robertson, Renee Galloway, Constance Hollands, James Johnson, Veda Johnson, Craig Miller, Melody Mobley, Brenard Reel, Tynisa Richardson, Lloyd Ryan, Patrick Selig, Melissa Smith, Donnie Southers, Jimmy Tuprin, Vtessa Watson. (Dillon, Kevin)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Shiva Finance, LLC d/b/a Advance Financial 24/7 by Deborah Bauer-Robertson, Renee Galloway, Constance Hollands, James Johnson, Veda Johnson, Craig Miller, Melody Mobley, Brenard Reel, Tynisa Richardson, Lloyd Ryan, Patrick Selig, Melissa Smith, Donnie Southers, Jimmy Tuprin, Vtessa Watson. (Dillon, Kevin)
July 20, 2020 Filing attorney notified to file proposed summons. (jsmi, )
July 20, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge David J. Novak. (jsmi, )
July 19, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7307560.), filed by Patrick Selig, Melody Mobley, Renee Galloway, Deborah Bauer-Robertson, Donnie Southers, Craig Miller, Constance Hollands, Tynisa Richardson, Melissa Smith, Jimmy Tuprin, Vtessa Watson, Brenard Reel, James Johnson, Lloyd Ryan, Veda Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dillon, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauer-Robertson et al v. Shiva Finance, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Galloway
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Dillon
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Amy Leigh Austin
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Michael Christopher Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Ryan
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Dillon
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Amy Leigh Austin
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Michael Christopher Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Miller
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Dillon
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Amy Leigh Austin
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Michael Christopher Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Smith
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Dillon
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Amy Leigh Austin
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Michael Christopher Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Johnson
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Dillon
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Amy Leigh Austin
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Michael Christopher Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Southers
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Dillon
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Amy Leigh Austin
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Michael Christopher Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Tuprin
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Dillon
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Amy Leigh Austin
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Michael Christopher Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenard Reel
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Dillon
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Amy Leigh Austin
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Michael Christopher Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Selig
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Dillon
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Amy Leigh Austin
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Michael Christopher Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Bauer-Robertson
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Dillon
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Amy Leigh Austin
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Michael Christopher Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Hollands
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Dillon
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Amy Leigh Austin
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Michael Christopher Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vtessa Watson
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Dillon
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Amy Leigh Austin
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Michael Christopher Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Mobley
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Dillon
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Amy Leigh Austin
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Michael Christopher Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veda Johnson
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Dillon
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Amy Leigh Austin
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Michael Christopher Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tynisa Richardson
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Dillon
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Represented By: Amy Leigh Austin
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Represented By: Michael Christopher Litman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harpeth Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiva Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?