Dinwiddie County v. Mallinckrodt, PLC et al
Plaintiff: Va Dinwiddie County
Defendant: Caremark RX, L.L.C., McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Mylan Institutional Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., Mallinckrodt LLC, Allergan Finance, LLC, Barr Laboratories, Inc., McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., Insource, Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc., Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic, Cardinal Health, Inc., Caremark, L.L.C., Actavis, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walgreen Co., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., OptumRX, Inc., Optum, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Indivior Inc., WalMart Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Specgx LLC, Express Scripts, Inc., Mallinckrodt, PLC, Rite Aid Corp., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Eckerd Corporation, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Does 1 - 100, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00606
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Stay filed by Va Dinwiddie County. (Conrod, Richard)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER (Granting Defendants' Motion for Temporary Stay) it is ORDERED that Defendants' Motion #19 is GRANTED and this matter is STAYED pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's determination regarding transfer of this case. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 09/23/2020. (tjoh, )
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF JUSTIN M. SIZEMORE TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION - Pending is the Motion of Justin M. Sizemore to Withdraw Appearance on Behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation in the above-referenced matter. Upon consideration, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion of Justin M. Sizemore to Withdraw Appearance on Behalf of AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/17/2020. (smej, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sizemore, Justin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Va Dinwiddie County. (Conrod, Richard)
September 10, 2020 Filing 36 Memorandum in Support re: #35 CONDITIONAL MOTION for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. (Scott, Emily). Modified docket text at filing attorney's request on 9/11/2020. (sbea,)
September 10, 2020 Filing 35 CONDITIONAL MOTION for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily). Modified docket text at filing attorney's request on 9/11/2020. (sbea,)
September 10, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Officer Removed Cases, #2 Exhibit B - Cahill Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Statement of Work (DOD Contract), #4 Exhibit D - Part 1 - Donnelly Declaration with exhibits, #5 Exhibit D - Par 2 - Donnelly Declaration with exhibits)(Scott, Emily)
September 8, 2020 Filing 33 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Maria Durant, Esquire (Clerk re-sent documents to forwarding address on envelope). (tjoh, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Support re #19 MOTION to Stay filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Updated Federal Officer Removed Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Judge Polster Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Judge Greer Stay Order)(Scott, Emily)
August 27, 2020 Filing 31 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel)
August 27, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Perry Coburn on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Coburn, Samuel)
August 27, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Stay filed by Va Dinwiddie County. (Conrod, Richard)
August 27, 2020 Filing 28 Memorandum in Support re #27 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Va Dinwiddie County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - ES Military Health System SOW, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Decl. of William T. Cahill)(Conrod, Richard)
August 27, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Va Dinwiddie County. (Conrod, Richard)
August 25, 2020 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation. (Rottenborn, John)
August 25, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John Benjamin Rottenborn on behalf of McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. (Rottenborn, John)
August 25, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to First Amended Complaint by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the appearance of Jessalyn H. Zeigler of the law firm of Bass, Berry & Sims PLC and Andrew J. O'Connor of the law firm of Ropes & Gray LLP on behalf of Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC and SpecGx LLC is hereby withdrawn. Defendants will continue to be represented by Bass, Berry & Sims PLC. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 8/20/2020. (smej, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Sarah)
August 17, 2020 Filing 22 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail re-sent to Maria R. Durant, Esquire at forwarding address. (tjoh, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 20 Memorandum in Support re #19 MOTION to Stay filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CTO-169, #2 Exhibit 2 - List of Opioid Cases, #3 Exhibit 3 - Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - J. Polster Federal Officer Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Federal Officer Removed Cases, #6 Exhibit 6 - Additional Fed Officer Stay Orders)(Scott, Emily)
August 13, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily)
August 12, 2020 Notice of Correction re #17 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel. The filing user has been notified to refile the document as a Motion to Withdraw with a Proposed Order attached. (tjoh, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Miller, Sarah)
August 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Miller, Sarah)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Julian Wonjung Park for ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., and Express Scripts, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 08/10/2020. (tjoh, )
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Matthew Ivan Menchel for ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., and Express Scripts, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 08/10/2020. (tjoh, )
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Steven Gary Kobre for ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., and Express Scripts, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 08/10/2020. (tjoh, )
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Adriana Riviere-Badell for ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., and Express Scripts, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 08/10/2020. (tjoh, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven G. Kobre and Certification of Local Counsel Emily M. Scott Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7342368. by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew I. Menchel and Certification of Local Counsel Emily M. Scott Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7342355. by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Adriana Riviere-Badell and Certification of Local Counsel Emily M. Scott Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7342338. by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Julian W. Park and Certification of Local Counsel Emily M. Scott Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7342318. by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner A. Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from the Clerk to all counsel not admitted in the USCA EDVA re: Local Rule 83.1. (copy enclosed). (tjoh, )
August 7, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (tjoh, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7340485.), filed by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Opioid Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - (1 of 5) State Court File, #3 Exhibit 2 - (2 of 5) State Court File, #4 Exhibit 2 - (3 of 5) State Court File, #5 Exhibit 2 - (4 of 5) State Court File, #6 Exhibit 2 - (5 of 5) State Court File, #7 Exhibit 3 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, Emily) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/7/2020) (tjoh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dinwiddie County v. Mallinckrodt, PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX, L.L.C.
Represented By: Blair Gerard Brown
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Rebecca Cheryl Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Steven Gary Kobre
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Represented By: Julian Wonjung Park
Represented By: Matthew Ivan Menchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Represented By: Blair Gerard Brown
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.
Represented By: John Benjamin Rottenborn
Represented By: Benjamin C. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Christopher Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Christopher Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Blair Gerard Brown
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Represented By: Blair Gerard Brown
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Steven Gary Kobre
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Represented By: Julian Wonjung Park
Represented By: Matthew Ivan Menchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Rebecca Cheryl Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Represented By: Blair Gerard Brown
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C.
Represented By: Blair Gerard Brown
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Boone
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Boone
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart Inc.
Represented By: William George Laxton
Represented By: Alisha Marie Crovetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Brent Ryan Gary
Represented By: Justin Michael Sizemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Blair Gerard Brown
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Steven Gary Kobre
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Represented By: Julian Wonjung Park
Represented By: Matthew Ivan Menchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Represented By: Steven Gary Kobre
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Represented By: Julian Wonjung Park
Represented By: Matthew Ivan Menchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckerd Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Brian Boone
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Blair Gerard Brown
Represented By: Shannan Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Christopher Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Va Dinwiddie County
Represented By: Tyler Christopher Southall
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Represented By: Grant Edward Morris, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?