Davis v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Francis Davis and Frances Davis
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00637
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER - Jury Trial set for 4/27/2021 at 9:30 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/2/2020) (rpiz)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Cameron Beck, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (Beck, Donald)
October 2, 2020 Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
October 1, 2020 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/1/2020 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Frances Davis. (Bugg, Albert) (text modified on 10/2/2020 to correct spelling of Plaintiff's first name - rpiz)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Davis Bugg, Jr on behalf of Frances Davis (Bugg, Albert) (text modified on 10/2/2020 to correct spelling of Plaintiff's first name - rpiz)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Kaseorg, Karissa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Kaseorg, Karissa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7356455.), filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, Defendant's Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaseorg, Karissa)
August 18, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (tjoh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Karissa Thomas Kaseorg
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Davis
Represented By: Albert Davis Bugg, III
Represented By: Albert Davis Bugg, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Davis
Represented By: Albert Davis Bugg, III
Represented By: Albert Davis Bugg, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?