Estate of Jerry Theodore McCallup Jr. et al v. Envoy of Williamsburg et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Veronica McCallup, DSC and Estate of Jerry Theodore McCallup Jr.
Defendant: The doctors in charge of care and doctors who cared for Mr. Jerry Theodore McCallup Jr., Envoy Corporate Offices, Consulate Health Care, Envoy Affiliate Corporations, Police that took Mr. Jerry Theodore McCallup from his home, Fahad Al-Jarboua, Jeremy McCallup's Wife, Wendy Evans, Jeremy McCallup, Sentara Health Care, Department of Human Services Social Services Division, County of James City County, Ciera, Adam Kinsman, United States Army Fort Bragg, Judge Williamsburg, City of Williamsburg, Britany Moore, Scarlett Huang, Any and all insurance policies of plaintiff Jerry Theodore McCallup Jr., Sheriffs James City County Government Center, Brian L. Stevenson, Jerry Theo McCallup, Mark R. Herring, Deborah Shelton Al-Jarboua, Commonwealth Attorney and Board of Supervisors, Williamsburg Human Services, City of Williamsburg Department of Human Services and Envoy of Williamsburg
Case Number: 3:2020cv00753
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #12 Notice of Appeal (lgar, )
November 20, 2020 Filing 13 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #12 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (lgar, )
November 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Estate of Jerry Theodore McCallup Jr. and Veronica McCallup re: #11 Order. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). Filing fee was not received. (sbea,)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that this matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to File Complaint Under Seal (ECF No. #6 ) and Motion for Emergency Order to Cease and Desist (ECF No. #10 ) (please see Order for additional information.) Accordingly, finding Plaintiff's filings (ECF Nos. #6 , #9 , #10 ) to be frivolous and without an arguable basis in fact or law, the Court hereby DENIES the requested relief in each filing (ECF Nos. #6 , #9 , #10 .) The Court reaffirms that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and that therefore the Court will not provide a substantive ruling on any further documents filed by Plaintiff in this case. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 11/13/2020. Copy mailed to Plaintiff Dr. Veronica McCallup, DSC. (walk, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Emergency Order to Cease and Desist of Fahad Al-Jarboua by Veronica McCallup, DSC. (Attachments: #1 Attachments and #2 Letter from Plaintiff Dr. Veronica McCallup, DSC). (walk, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Veronica McCallup, DSC to Appear Telephonically and Video Conference, Remote and Virtual. (walk, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 8 SEALED First Amended Complaint (Part 2, Pages 131-239) re: #6 MOTION to File Complaint Under Seal by Veronica McCallup, DSC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summonses, #2 Cover Letter). (walk, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 SEALED First Amended Complaint (Part 1, Pages 1-130) re: #6 MOTION to File Complaint Under Seal by Veronica McCallup, DSC. (walk, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to File Complaint Under Seal by Veronica McCallup, DSC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Letter from Dr. Veronica McCallup, DSC and #3 Letter from Dr. Veronica McCallup, DSC). (walk, ). Modified docket entry on 11/06/2020. (walk, ).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff has failed to comply with this Court's Memorandum Order (ECF No. 3), the Court hereby DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #1 ). The Court hereby notifies Plaintiff that should she wish to appeal this Order, written notice of the appeal must be filed within thirty (30) days of entry hereof. Failure to file a notice of appeal within the stated period may result in the loss of the right to appeal. This case is now CLOSED. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 11/2/2020. Order was mailed to the pro se plaintiffs. (sbea, )
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' #2 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 09/30/2020. Copies sent to Plaintiff(s) electronically. (walk, )
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER that this matter comes before the Court on pro se Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (ECF No. #1 ) (please see Memorandum Order for additional information.) Having reviewed Dr. McCallup's financial affidavit, the Court finds Dr. McCallup qualified to proceed in forma pauperis as to the claims brought by Dr. McCall up in her individual capacity. As such, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent Dr. McCallup brings claims on her own behalf. However, the Court cannot grant in forma pauperis status to a corporation, or to an estate. Rowland v. California Men's Colony, 506 U.S. 194, 196 (1993) ("only a natural person may qualify for treatment in forma pauperis under [28 U.S.C.] 1915."); In re Estate of Van Putten, 553 F. App'x 328 (4th Cir. 2014) (denying estate's request to proceed IFP under the same rationale.). Accordingly, the Court hereby DENIES the Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to the extent it seeks IFP status for the Estate of Jerry Theodore McCallup, Jr., or CTI, Inc. (please see Memorandum Order for additional information.) Thus, the Court hereby DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all claims brought by Dr. McCallup on behalf of CTI, Inc., or the Estate of Jerry Theodore McCallup., Jr. Dr. McCallup may, however, bring claims in her individual capacity. Nonetheless, a review of Dr. McCallup's Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) reveals that Dr. McCallup's personal claims are so intertwined with the claims that she brings on behalf of her brother's estate and the corporation that the Court cannot intelligibly distinguish and assess the separate claims. (ECF No. #1 .) Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS Dr. McCallup to file a particularized amended complaint. If Dr. McCallup elects to pursue claims on behalf of her brother's estate or CTI, Inc., she shall engage counsel and cause counsel to enter a notice of appearance on behalf of the estate and the corporation and pay the required filing fee. If Dr. McCallup does not engage counsel, she may only assert claims on behalf of herself in the particularized amended complaint. The particularized amended complaint SHALL COMPLY with the following directions (please see Memorandum Order for additional information.) It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 09/29/2020. Copy mailed to Dr. McCallup at her address of record.(walk, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Estate of Jerry Theodore McCallup Jr., Veronica McCallup, DSC. (asho, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Veronica McCallup, DSC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summonses, #4 Local Rule 83.1)(asho, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Jerry Theodore McCallup Jr. et al v. Envoy of Williamsburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The doctors in charge of care and doctors who cared for Mr. Jerry Theodore McCallup Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envoy Corporate Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consulate Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envoy Affiliate Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police that took Mr. Jerry Theodore McCallup from his home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fahad Al-Jarboua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy McCallup's Wife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy McCallup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentara Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Human Services Social Services Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of James City County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ciera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Kinsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Fort Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Williamsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Williamsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britany Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scarlett Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any and all insurance policies of plaintiff Jerry Theodore McCallup Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriffs James City County Government Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian L. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Theo McCallup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Shelton Al-Jarboua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Attorney and Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williamsburg Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Williamsburg Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envoy of Williamsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Veronica McCallup, DSC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Jerry Theodore McCallup Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?