Straight Line Drive, Inc. v. Vanatta, et al.
Plaintiff: Straight Line Drive, Inc.
Defendant: Mr. Lee Vanatta and Mr. Jitan Kuverji
Case Number: 3:2020cv00779
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Referring Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Court Reporter Harding, OCR): Motion Hearing held on 12/3/2020 re #2 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by defendant Jitan Kuverji, and for an Initial Pretrial Conference. Argument heard. Findings given from the Bench; motion granted without prejudice. Initial Pretrial Conference postponed until case reaches appropriate posture for setting of a trial date. (rpiz)
November 24, 2020 Set Hearings as to #2 Motion to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2020 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson; Initial Pretrial Conference rescheduled to 11:00 AM on 12/3/2020 (rpiz)
November 19, 2020 Filing 17 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Lee Vanatta by Straight Line Drive, Inc.. (Upton, Jennifer)
November 13, 2020 Filing 16 Defendant Jitan Kuverji's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Jitan Kuverji.(Mullins, James)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 10:45 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Order issued by deputy clerk at the direction of the Court) (rpiz)
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) filed by Jitan Kuverji. (Mullins, James)
October 26, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) filed by Straight Line Drive, Inc.. (Upton, Jennifer)
October 23, 2020 Notice of Correction re: #9 Request for Entry of Default as to Lee Vanatta; Clerk notified filing attorney of correct language that needs to be included for the completion of the Request for Entry of Default. Attorney is requested to amend the Affidavit and re-file it, linking it back to #9 Request for Entry of Default. (sbea,)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Samuel Alexander Mullman Pro Hac Vice for Straight Line Drive, Inc. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/22/2020. (sbea,)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Kelly Wallace to appear as Pro Hac Vice for Straight Line Drive, Inc. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/22/2020. (sbea,)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (Substitution of Counsel). It appearing just and proper to do so, Frederick Daniel Taylor and the law firm of Bush & Taylor PC are RELIEVED as counsel for Plaintiff. Jennifer L. Upton and Andrew G. Mauck are SUBSTITUTED as counsel in this matter. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/22/2020. (sbea,)
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Entry of Default as to Lee Vanatta by Straight Line Drive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Affidavit of Samuel A. Mullman)(Upton, Jennifer)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel A. Mullman and Certification of Local Counsel Jennifer L. Upton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7457203. by Straight Line Drive, Inc.. (Upton, Jennifer)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Wallace and Certification of Local Counsel Jennifer L. Upton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7457172. by Straight Line Drive, Inc.. (Upton, Jennifer)
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Straight Line Drive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Upton, Jennifer)
October 15, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Substitution of Counsel of Frederick Daniel Taylor by Andrew Gray Mauck on behalf of Straight Line Drive, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney)(Mauck, Andrew)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Substitution of Counsel of Frederick Daniel Taylor by Jennifer Lynne Upton on behalf of Straight Line Drive, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Upton, Jennifer)
October 15, 2020 Notice of Correction re: #4 and #5 Notices of Substitution of Counsel, Clerk is requesting filing attorneys be sure to include on Certificate of Service that documents are mailed to pro se defendant, Lee Vanatta. (sbea,),
October 15, 2020 Case REASSIGNED to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. District Judge Robert E. Payne no longer assigned to the case. (sbea,)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) filed by Jitan Kuverji. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jitan Kuverji)(Mullins, James)
October 13, 2020 Notice of Correction re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal); Clerk notified filing attorney of proper filing procedures for filing a Motion. Filing attorney was requested to refile the Memorandum in Support as a separate document to include the Exhibit. (sbea, )
October 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) by Jitan Kuverji. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit)(Mullins, James)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal (Filing Fee $400, Receipt Number: 0422-7432240), filed by Jitan Kuverji. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Initial Complaint filed in Surry County)(Mullins, James). Modified docket text on 10/6/2020. (sbea,) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/27/2020 as 2 documents had to be redacted) (tjoh, ).
October 6, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (sbea,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Straight Line Drive, Inc. v. Vanatta, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Lee Vanatta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Jitan Kuverji
Represented By: James Anderson Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Straight Line Drive, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick Daniel Taylor
Represented By: Kelly Wallace
Represented By: Samuel Alexander Mullman
Represented By: Jennifer Lynne Upton
Represented By: Andrew Gray Mauck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?