Gerald v. Virginia Department of Treasury et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Gerald
Defendant: Virginia Department of Treasury and City of Alexandria
Case Number: 3:2020cv00802
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Referring Judge: Elizabeth W Hanes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 Consent to Collection of Fees by Jeremy Gerald. (Attachments: #1 Conditional Consent to Collection of Fees, #2 Envelope). (sbea,)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jeremy Gerald. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). (sbea,)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Lebanon Correctional Institution as to Jeremy Gerald. (Attachment: #1 Inmate Statement). (sbea,)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Conditionally Docketing Action) that Plaintiff, an Ohio inmate, has submitted this civil action. He also has applied to proceed in forma pauperis. It is ORDERED that: 1. This action is CONDITIONALLY docketed. 2. Within thirty (30) days from the date of entry hereof, Plaintiff must submit a statement under oath or under penalty of perjury that: (please see Memorandum Order for additional information.) It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 10/30/2020. Copy mailed to Plaintiff with IFP and Consent to Collection of Fees forms. Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement form and Letter mailed to Lebanon Correctional Institution. (walk, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jeremy Gerald. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Statement). (sbea,)
October 14, 2020 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Jeremy Gerald. (sbea,)
October 14, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT filed by Jeremy Gerald against Department of Treasury and the City of Alexandria, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Intent, #2 Letter to Police Dept., #3 Letter, #4 Envelope). (sbea,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerald v. Virginia Department of Treasury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alexandria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Gerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?