United States of America v. Sullivan
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Joseph P. Sullivan
Case Number: 3:2020cv00869
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Joseph P. Sullivan (through Private Mailbox) on 12/09/2020, filed by United States of America. (Kalyniuk, Alexander)
December 23, 2020 Notice of Correction re #6 Affidavit of Service; filing attorney selected the wrong filing event. The correct event is Summons Returned Executed which would prompted the answer response due date. Defendant was served on 12/9/2020 and answer due date will be 12/30/2020. (sbea,)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Benton T. Morton to appear as Pro Hac Vice for United States of America. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 11/17/2020. (sbea,)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Benton T. Morton and Certification of Local Counsel Alexander R. Kalyniuk by United States of America. (Kalyniuk, Alexander)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Joseph P. Sullivan **NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (sbea,)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons as to Joseph P. Sullivan by United States of America. (Kalyniuk, Alexander)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Joseph P. Sullivan, filed by United States of America. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kalyniuk, Alexander). Modified docket text on 11/12/2020. (sbea,)
November 12, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (sbea,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander R. Kalyniuk
Represented By: Robert P. McIntosh
Represented By: Benton T. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?