Manuel v. Crowder
Plaintiff: Ralph A. Manuel
Defendant: Valda A. Crowder
Case Number: 3:2020cv00914
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Compliance by Ralph A. Manuel (please also see Document #7 ). (walk, )
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph A. Manuel Valda A. Crowder served on 12/7/2020, answer due 12/28/2020 (Williamson, Thomas)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Valda A. Crowder via the Secretary of the Commonwealth of Virginia. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ask your process server to return the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (walk, )
January 4, 2021 Notice of Correction re: Document #4 ; the filing user is requested to refile the document using the correct filing event, Summons Return Executed (please refer to Document #3 for additional information.) (walk, )
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons by Ralph A. Manuel. (Williamson, Thomas)
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Valda R. Crowder, MD on December 7, 2020, filed by Ralph A. Manuel. (Williamson, Thomas)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Valda A. Crowder. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ask your process server to return the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (walk, )
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Ralph A. Manuel. (Williamson, Thomas)
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $402, Receipt Number: 0422-7520689), filed by Ralph A Manuel. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet )(Williamson, Thomas). Clerk replaced Complaint to include Civil Action Number on 12/1/2020. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 12/1/2020. (sbea,)
December 1, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (sbea,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manuel v. Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph A. Manuel
Represented By: Thomas Winfield Williamson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valda A. Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?