Shaffer v. Kroger Limited Partnership I
Plaintiff: Rebecca Shaffer
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Case Number: 3:2020cv00926
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Notice of Correction re #9 Notice of Appearance - Clerk notified Ms. Berry that an attorney cannot file on behalf of another attorney and that she must be CM/ECF qualified to file in this court. (asho, )
January 14, 2021 Settlement Conference set for 7/7/2021 at 9:30 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes. (mful)
January 13, 2021 Filing 11 Discovery Plan by Rebecca Shaffer.(Halperin, Jonathan)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE The Court has scheduled this case for a settlement conference on July 7, 2021 at 9:30 A.M. At that time, the parties shall report to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 1/12/2020. (tjoh, )
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Allon Nichols, Jr on behalf of Kroger Limited Partnership I (Nichols, Jon)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER - Jury Trial set for 11/29/2021 at 9:30 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/8/2021) (rpiz)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (Settlement Conference Referral) the settlement conference and proceedings required by section I(E)(1) of Pretrial Schedule A are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes. Counsel shall be responsible for contacting the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Hanes within five (5) days of the date of this Order to schedule the conference, which should occur at least thirty (30) days before the start of trial and at such time as Magistrate Judge Hanes shall approve. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/8/2021. Copies distributed as directed.(asho, )
January 8, 2021 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes for settlement purposes. (jsau, )
January 7, 2021 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/7/2021 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Order issued by deputy clerk at the direction of the Court) (rpiz)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kroger Limited Partnership I, filed by Rebecca Shaffer.(Vu, Huyen)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Huyen Thanh Vu on behalf of Rebecca Shaffer (Vu, Huyen)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 Declaration of Erik Lutson by Kroger Limited Partnership I. (Nichols, Jon) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/4/2020) (jsmi, ).
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Kroger Limited Partnership I. (Nichols, Jon) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/4/2020) (jsmi, ).
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7527458.), filed by Kroger Limited Partnership I. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Answer)(Nichols, Jon) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/4/2020) (jsmi, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsmi, ).
December 4, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (jsmi, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaffer v. Kroger Limited Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: Jon Allon Nichols, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Shaffer
Represented By: Andrew Lucchetti
Represented By: Huyen Thanh Vu
Represented By: Jonathan Eric Halperin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?