Hill v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Taumara Nicole Hill
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 3:2020cv00930
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Referring Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, filed by Taumara Nicole Hill. (smej, )
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Upon due consideration, the Court FINDS Hill unable to pay the costs of proceeding in this case. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the Motion and DIRECTS the Clerk to docket the Complaint. The Court ORDERS Hill to file with the Court the Ghostwriting Form (a copy of which is enclosed) no later than February 16, 2021. Failure to comply with this request will result in the case being dismissed without prejudice. The Court ORDERS that the Clerk provisionally file the proffered Complaint; and it is further ORDERED that, no later than February 16, 2021, Hill SHALL file an Amended Complaint, which outlines in simple and straightforward terms why she thinks that she is entitled to relief and why the Court has jurisdiction over her case. The Court ADVISES Hill that, if she does not satisfy this requirement, the provisional grant of relief to proceed in forma pauperis will be withdrawn and the Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis will be denied. The failure to strictly comply with the Court's directives and with applicable rules will result in DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 1/12/2021. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff with a Ghostwriting Form) (smej, )
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to reassign this case (3:20cv930) to United States District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 01/07/2021. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff. (tjoh, )
January 7, 2021 Case Reassigned to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (tjoh, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Taumara Nicole Hill. (Attachments: #1 proposed complaint)(tjoh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taumara Nicole Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?