Harris v. Hudson et al
Plaintiff: Michael Harris
Defendant: Captain Diehl, Superintendent Kevin Hudson and Major McRae
Case Number: 3:2021cv00037
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth W Hanes
Referring Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER The action is FILED and Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 . Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #5 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #8 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The institution where Plaintiff is confined will mail to the Court twenty percent (20%) of all of Plaintiffs deposits until the balance of $350.00 is paid. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 3/16/2021. A copy of this Memorandum Order sent to Plaintiff; A copy of this Memorandum Order and Plaintiffs consent to collection of fees form sent to the accounting department at Plaintiffs place of incarceration as directed. (asho, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 Response to Memorandum Order, filed by Michael Harris. (asho, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Harris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(asho, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 Response to #3 Memorandum Order, filed by Michael Harris. (asho, ) ( #1 Envelope) (asho, ).
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 Consent to Collection of Fees by Michael Harris. (asho, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Michael Harris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(asho, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement RECEIVED. (asho, )
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER that this action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within 30 days of entry hereof; Clerk to obtain certified copy of Plaintiffs trust fund account for 6 month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; Plaintiff to return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days of entry hereof. See Order for more details. Copies mailed: Yes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 02/02/2021. (tjoh, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Harris. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(asho, )
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT filed by Michael Harris against Captain Diehl, Kevin Hudson, Major McRae (Attachments: #1 Cover Letters, #2 Envelope)(asho, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Hudson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Diehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Kevin Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?