Sekerdy v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Sekerdy, Jr.
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart Supercenter - Store #2295
Case Number: 3:2021cv00055
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Wiley Jacob Latham, IV on behalf of Alexander Sekerdy, Jr (Latham, Wiley)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 9:45 AM via Zoom before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Order issued by deputy clerk at the direction of the Court) (rpiz)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Supercenter - Store #2295. (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7607102.), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Supercenter - Store #2295. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit E)(Gonzalez, Jonathan) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/1/2021) (asho, ).
February 1, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (asho, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sekerdy v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Jonathan Warren Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Supercenter - Store #2295
Represented By: Jonathan Warren Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Sekerdy, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Poole Yakubisin
Represented By: Wiley Jacob Latham, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?