Banks et al v. City of Fredericksburg et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Brown, Lanaisha Foreman, Taylor Johns, Chanise Nycole Jackson, Angelina Marsella, Julian Stebbins-Sharpless, Alexy Maratellos, Victoria Lough, Tyus Jones and Eddie Banks
Defendant: John Doe Officers 1-50, Crystal Hill, Timothy J Baroody, City of Fredericksburg, David P Decatur, Brian Layton and County of Stafford
Case Number: 3:2021cv00065
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER. See for complete details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 03/29/2021. (Attachment: #1 Schedule A) (nbrow)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2021 at 11:20 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Robert E. Payne. See for complete details. Issued at the direction of the Court. Signed by Nikki Brown with the permission of District Judge Robert E. Payne on 03/29/2021. (nbrow)
March 13, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynn McGovern on behalf of Timothy J Baroody, City of Fredericksburg, Crystal Hill, Brian Layton (McGovern, Jennifer)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Tara Murray to appear Pro hac vice for Eddie Banks, Ryan Brown, Lanaisha Foreman, Chanise Nycole Jackson, Taylor Johns, Tyus Jones, Victoria Lough, Alexy Maratellos, Angelina Marsella, Julian Stebbins-Sharpless. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/9/2021. (smej, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Tara Murray and Certification of Local Counsel Terry C. Frank Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7661565. by Eddie Banks, Ryan Brown, Lanaisha Foreman, Chanise Nycole Jackson, Taylor Johns, Tyus Jones, Victoria Lough, Alexy Maratellos, Angelina Marsella, Julian Stebbins-Sharpless. (Frank, Terry)
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Catherine Frank on behalf of Eddie Banks, Ryan Brown, Lanaisha Foreman, Chanise Nycole Jackson, Taylor Johns, Tyus Jones, Victoria Lough, Alexy Maratellos, Angelina Marsella, Julian Stebbins-Sharpless (Frank, Terry)
March 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lee Parrish on behalf of Timothy J Baroody, City of Fredericksburg, Crystal Hill, Brian Layton (Parrish, Jennifer)
March 2, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Timothy J Baroody, City of Fredericksburg, Crystal Hill, Brian Layton.(Corrigan, David)
March 2, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Corrigan on behalf of Timothy J Baroody, City of Fredericksburg, Crystal Hill, Brian Layton (Corrigan, David)
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Maurice Scott Fisher, Jr on behalf of Timothy J Baroody, City of Fredericksburg, Crystal Hill, Brian Layton (Fisher, Maurice)
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by David P Decatur.(Francuzenko, Alexander)
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Stafford County by Eddie Banks, Ryan Brown, Lanaisha Foreman, Chanise Nycole Jackson, Taylor Johns, Tyus Jones, Victoria Lough, Alexy Maratellos, Angelina Marsella, Julian Stebbins-Sharpless (Allen, Michael)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Soohyun Choi to appear as Pro hac vice for Eddie Banks, Ryan Brown, Lanaisha Foreman, Chanise Nycole Jackson, Taylor Johns, Tyus Jones, Victoria Lough, Alexy Maratellos, Angelina Marsella, Julian Stebbins-Sharpless. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 2/9/2021. (smej, )
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Jia Michelle Cobb to appear as Pro hac vice for Chanise Nycole Jackson, Taylor Johns, Tyus Jones, Victoria Lough, Alexy Maratellos, Angelina Marsella, Julian Stebbins-Sharpless. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 2/9/2021. (smej, )
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Timothy J Baroody, David P Decatur, City of Fredericksburg, Crystal Hill, Brian Layton, County of Stafford. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, )
February 5, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (smej, )
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Soohyun Choi and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Allen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7614475. by Eddie Banks, Ryan Brown, Lanaisha Foreman, Chanise Nycole Jackson, Taylor Johns, Tyus Jones, Victoria Lough, Alexy Maratellos, Angelina Marsella, Julian Stebbins-Sharpless. (Allen, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jia Cobb and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Allen Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7614463. by Eddie Banks, Ryan Brown, Lanaisha Foreman, Chanise Nycole Jackson, Taylor Johns, Tyus Jones, Victoria Lough, Alexy Maratellos, Angelina Marsella, Julian Stebbins-Sharpless. (Allen, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Eddie Banks, Ryan Brown, Lanaisha Foreman, Chanise Nycole Jackson, Taylor Johns, Tyus Jones, Victoria Lough, Alexy Maratellos, Angelina Marsella, Julian Stebbins-Sharpless. (Allen, Michael)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint (Filing Fee: $402.00, Receipt Number: 0422-7614215), filed by Victoria Lough, Ryan Brown, Eddie Banks, Tyus Jones, Lanaisha Foreman, Angelina Marsella, Alexy Maratellos, Chanise Nycole Jackson, Julian Stebbins-Sharpless, Taylor Johns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Allen, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks et al v. City of Fredericksburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Brown
Represented By: Michael G. Allen
Represented By: Terry Catherine Frank
Represented By: Tara Murray
Represented By: Jia Michelle Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanaisha Foreman
Represented By: Michael G. Allen
Represented By: Terry Catherine Frank
Represented By: Tara Murray
Represented By: Jia Michelle Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Johns
Represented By: Michael G. Allen
Represented By: Terry Catherine Frank
Represented By: Tara Murray
Represented By: Jia Michelle Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanise Nycole Jackson
Represented By: Michael G. Allen
Represented By: Terry Catherine Frank
Represented By: Tara Murray
Represented By: Jia Michelle Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Marsella
Represented By: Michael G. Allen
Represented By: Terry Catherine Frank
Represented By: Tara Murray
Represented By: Jia Michelle Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Stebbins-Sharpless
Represented By: Michael G. Allen
Represented By: Terry Catherine Frank
Represented By: Tara Murray
Represented By: Jia Michelle Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexy Maratellos
Represented By: Michael G. Allen
Represented By: Terry Catherine Frank
Represented By: Tara Murray
Represented By: Jia Michelle Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Lough
Represented By: Michael G. Allen
Represented By: Terry Catherine Frank
Represented By: Tara Murray
Represented By: Jia Michelle Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyus Jones
Represented By: Michael G. Allen
Represented By: Terry Catherine Frank
Represented By: Tara Murray
Represented By: Jia Michelle Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Banks
Represented By: Michael G. Allen
Represented By: Terry Catherine Frank
Represented By: Tara Murray
Represented By: Jia Michelle Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Officers 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Hill
Represented By: David P. Corrigan
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Parrish
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn McGovern
Represented By: Maurice Scott Fisher, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J Baroody
Represented By: David P. Corrigan
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Parrish
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn McGovern
Represented By: Maurice Scott Fisher, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fredericksburg
Represented By: David P. Corrigan
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Parrish
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn McGovern
Represented By: Maurice Scott Fisher, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P Decatur
Represented By: Alexander Francuzenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Layton
Represented By: David P. Corrigan
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Parrish
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn McGovern
Represented By: Maurice Scott Fisher, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?