United States of America v. Williams
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kenya Williams
Case Number: 3:2021cv00098
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Court GRANTS Defendant Kenya Williams's #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Williams SHALL file a responsive pleading no later than May 1, 2021. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 3/24/2021. Copy mailed to Williams. (jsmi, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kenya Williams. (jsmi, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kenya Williams. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons as to Kenya Williams, as the Administrator of the Estate of Joyce T. Brown, Deceased by United States of America. (Kalyniuk, Alexander)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against Kenya Williams, as the Administrator of the Estate of Joyce T. Brown, Deceased, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A, Qualification of Administrator, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kalyniuk, Alexander)
February 19, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jsmi, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenya Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander R. Kalyniuk
Represented By: Robert P. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?