Pruitt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: John Christian Pruitt
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 3:2021cv00296
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 6/19/2020. (smej, )
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 7/20/2018. (smej, )
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REVISED STANDING ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 10/17/2013. (smej, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate Reporting Service by Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 6/18/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Hambrick, Jonathan)
June 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Holland Hambrick on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Hambrick, Jonathan)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Melissa A. Palmer for John Christian Pruitt. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 5/10/2021. (asho, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, )
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa A. Palmer and Certification of Local Counsel John O. Goss Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7777241. by John Christian Pruitt. (Goss, John)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by John Christian Pruitt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Goss, John)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7777177.), filed by John Christian Pruitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goss, John)
May 7, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge David J. Novak. (tjoh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pruitt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jonathan Holland Hambrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Christian Pruitt
Represented By: John Osborne Goss
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?