Walden Jr. v. Action Park of Williamsburg, VA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ronald W. Walden Jr.
Defendant: Action Park of Williamsburg, VA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00311
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert E Payne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the Motion (ECF No. #6 ) is granted with modification. It is further ORDERED that the defendant, Action Park of Williamsburg, Va., Inc., shall file its Answer and any other motions with respect to the Complaint by July 15, 2021. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Robert E. Payne on 6/9/2021. (sbea,)
June 8, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Action Park of Williamsburg, VA, Inc.. (Dorans, Barry)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Action Park of Williamsburg, VA, Inc.. (Dorans, Barry)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry Dorans on behalf of Action Park of Williamsburg, VA, Inc. (Dorans, Barry)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Action Park of Williamsburg, VA, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Ronald W. Walden Jr.. (Waters, Deborah)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7791205.), filed by Ronald W. Walden Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Waters, Deborah) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/17/2021) (jsmi, ).
May 17, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (jsmi, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walden Jr. v. Action Park of Williamsburg, VA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Park of Williamsburg, VA, Inc.
Represented By: Barry Dorans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald W. Walden Jr.
Represented By: Deborah C. Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?