Siegrist et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Siegrist and Marianne L. Siegrist
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00363
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: M Hannah Lauck
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ethicon LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Brown, John)
August 5, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ethicon LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Brown, John)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice Susan M. Ulrich for Plaintiffs, Marianne L. Siegrist and Stephen Siegrist. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 7/1/2021. (jpow, )
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Christopher Lester Johnson for plaintiffs Marianne L. Siegrist and Stephen Siegrist. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 7/1/2021. (jpow, )
July 1, 2021 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Susan M. Ulrich and Certification of Local Counsel Peter A. Kraus Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7871166. by Marianne L. Siegrist, Stephen Siegrist. (Kraus, Peter)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher L. Johnson and Certification of Local Counsel Peter A. Kraus Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7871149. by Marianne L. Siegrist, Stephen Siegrist. (Kraus, Peter)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Finding that good cause exists, Defendants' motion is HEREBY GRANTED. Defendants shall have until August 5, 2021 to file their responsive pleadings in this matter. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 6/28/2021. (sbea,)
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ethicon LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, John)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Brown on behalf of Ethicon LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Brown, John)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ethicon LLC, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jpow, )
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Johnson & Johnson by Marianne L. Siegrist, Stephen Siegrist. (Kraus, Peter)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Ethicon LLC by Marianne L. Siegrist, Stephen Siegrist. (Kraus, Peter)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Ethicon Inc. by Marianne L. Siegrist, Stephen Siegrist. (Kraus, Peter)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7829068.), filed by Marianne L. Siegrist, Stephen Siegrist. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kraus, Peter)
June 7, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge M. Hannah Lauck. (jpow, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siegrist et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Siegrist
Represented By: Peter Andrew Kraus
Represented By: Christopher Lester Johnson
Represented By: Susan M. Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne L. Siegrist
Represented By: Peter Andrew Kraus
Represented By: Christopher Lester Johnson
Represented By: Susan M. Ulrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: John Patrick Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: John Patrick Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon LLC
Represented By: John Patrick Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?