UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Manson
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: William Manson, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00419
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed on William Manson, Jr served on 6/30/2021, answer due 7/21/2021 (Carter, Kieran) Modified on 7/6/2021 (jpow, ).
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William Manson, Jr. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jpow, )
June 28, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (jpow, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Federal Taxes by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Carter, Kieran)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint for Federal Taxes, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carter, Kieran)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Manson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Manson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kieran O'Neill Carter
Represented By: Robert P. McIntosh
Represented By: David A. Hubbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?