Courthouse News Service v. Hade et al
Plaintiff: Courthouse News Service
Defendant: Karl R. Hade and Jacqueline C. Smith
Intervenor Defendant: Commonwealth of Virginia
Case Number: 3:2021cv00460
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Violation of Due Process and Equal Protection
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #93 Notice of Appeal, (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (smej, )
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 22-2110, Case Manager E. Borneisen, for #93 Notice of Appeal, filed by Courthouse News Service. (smej, )
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #92 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,, #48 Memorandum Opinion, #49 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,,,,,, #91 Memorandum Opinion by Courthouse News Service. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AVAEDC-8628387. (Carr, Dabney)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER (Resolving Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment) - For the reasons fully stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 66, 74) are GRANTED and Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 70) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/27/2022. (smej, )
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM OPINION (Resolving Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment). Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/27/2022. (smej, )
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER (Continuing Trial Date) THIS MATTER is currently set for a bench trial on September 29, 2022. The Court has determined that a continuance is necessary. Therefore, the bench trial is CONTINUED to November 10, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/9/2022. (asho, )
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Bench Trial reset for 11/10/2022 at 9:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 8/18/2022, before Judge Henry E. Hudson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Krista Liscio, Telephone number 804 916-2296. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 10/7/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/6/2022.(liscio, krista)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Court Reporter Harding, OCR): Motions Hearing held on 8/18/2022 re #66 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendant Commonwealth of Virginia, #70 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by plaintiff Courthouse News Service, and #74 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendant Jacqueline C. Smith. Argument heard. Motions taken under advisement by the Court; Memorandum Opinion to enter. (Attachment #1 Exhibit A submitted by defendant Commonwealth of Virginia) (rpiz)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPLY to Response to Motion re #66 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (McEntee, Robert)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPLY to Response to Motion re #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andras Bodis)(Carr, Dabney)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Memorandum in Opposition re #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Courthouse News Service, filed by Jacqueline C. Smith. (Steele, Heather)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Memorandum in Opposition re #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #66 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Girdner, #2 Ex. 1 to Girdner Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Carr, Dabney)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (McEntee, Robert)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re: ECF No. #80 , Notice; Filing attorney is notified Request for Authorization to Bring Electronic Device(s) into the USDC for the EDVA are not to be filed electronically through CM/ECF. The Clerk has made Judge Hudson's Chambers aware of the filing. No further action is required at this time. (jpow, )
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE by Commonwealth of Virginia, Karl R. Hade, Jacqueline C. Smith (Altmiller, John)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings as to #66 Motion for Summary Judgment, #70 Motion for Summary Judgment, and #74 Motion for Summary Judgment: Motions Hearing reset for 8/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAW AL OF APPEARANCE - The Court hereby GRANTS the Motion for the withdrawal of the appearance of Jessica R. Blaemire as counsel for Plaintiff Courthouse New Service in the above-captioned case. #78 It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall strike Jessica R. Blaemire's appearance and remove her from the CM/ECF service list in these matters. It is further ORDERED that the parties need not serve Jessica R. Blaemire with any pleadings, motions, or other papers in these matters. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 7/26/2022. (jpow, )
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Appearance of Jessica R. Blaemire by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Hearing as to #66 Motion for Summary Judgment, #70 Motion for Summary Judgment, and #74 Motion for Summary Judgment: Motions Hearing set for 8/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER - The Motion is hereby GRANTED #76 , and it is ORDERED that the deadline for filing Memoranda in Opposition to the Motions for Summary Judgment filed herein [ECF Nos. #66 , #70 , #74 ] is hereby EXTENDED from July 25, 2022 to August 1, 2022. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 7/22/2022. (jpow, )
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #66 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Memorandum in Support re #74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jacqueline C. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit #1)(Altmiller, John)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jacqueline C. Smith. (Altmiller, John)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re: ECF Nos. #68 and #69 ; The filing user's login does not match the signature on the document. The filing user must refile the document with the filing user's signature block, or the attorney whose signature block appears on the document must refile the document. The filing user has refiled both documents as ECF Nos. #74 and #75 . No further action is required at this time. (jpow, )
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Rose McNeill on behalf of Commonwealth of Virginia (McNeill, Erin)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Request for Oral Argument by Courthouse News Service re #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Carr, Dabney) Modified docket text on 7/14/2022 (jpow, ).
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Memorandum in Support re #70 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Girdner, #2 Declaration of Ryan Abbott, #3 Exhibit 1 to Abbott Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Abbott Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Abbott Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Abbott Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Abbott Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Abbott Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Abbott Declaration, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit E, #15 Exhibit F, #16 Exhibit G, #17 Exhibit H, #18 Exhibit I, #19 Exhibit J, #20 Exhibit K, #21 Exhibit L)(Carr, Dabney) (Main Document 71 replaced on 7/14/2022) (jpow, ).
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Courthouse News Service. (Carr, Dabney)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DISREGARD. Memorandum in Support re #68 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jacqueline C. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Paul Ferguson)(Steele, Heather) Modified on 7/14/2022 (jpow, ).
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 DISREGARD. MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jacqueline C. Smith. (Steele, Heather) Modified on 7/14/2022 (jpow, ).
July 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Memorandum in Support re #66 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McEntee, Robert) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/14/2022) (jpow, ). Modified on 7/14/2022 (jpow, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2022: #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (jpow, ).
July 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Commonwealth of Virginia. (McEntee, Robert)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE by Courthouse News Service Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance (Blaemire, Jessica)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - THIS MATTER is before the Court on the parties' Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of Karl R. Hade Without Prejudice filed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l). (ECF No. #60 .) The parties represent that Karl R. Hade, in his official capacity as Executive Secretary of the Office of Executive Secretary of the Virginia Supreme Court, should be dismissed from this action. Therefore, it appearing appropriate to do so, the Motion is GRANTED. Karl R. Hade, in his official capacity as Executive Secretary of the Office of Executive Secretary of the Virginia Supreme Court, is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 6/1/2022. (jpow, )
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER (Continuing Trial Date) - THIS MATTER is before the Court on the parties' Consent Motion to Continue filed on May 19, 2022. (ECF No. 57.) In accordance with that Motion, the Court granted the parties an extension to complete discovery and file summary judgment motions with leave to reschedule the trial at a later date. (Order, ECF No. 59.) The parties have now determined an appropriate date, and therefore, the Court CONTINUES the trial date to September 29, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 5/31/2022. (jpow, )
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B McEntee, III on behalf of Commonwealth of Virginia (McEntee, Robert)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Intent to Intervene by Commonwealth of Virginia (McEntee, Robert) Modified docket text on 6/1/2022 (jpow, ).
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION and Order for Dismissal of Karl R. Hade Without Prejudice by Courthouse News Service. (Carr, Dabney)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Bench Trial reset for 9/29/2022 at 9:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion (ECF No. #57 ) is GRANTED. The deadline for completion of fact discovery is hereby EXTENDED until July 5, 2022, and the parties shall file any motions for summary judgment not later than July 9, 2022. The parties are directed to contact the Court no later than seven (7) calendar days after entry of this order to reschedule the bench trial in this matter. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 5/23/2022. (jpow, )
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Memorandum in Support re #57 Consent MOTION to Continue filed by Courthouse News Service. (Carr, Dabney)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Consent MOTION to Continue by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER (Granting in Part the Joint Motion for Extension of Time) - THIS MATTER is before the Court on the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time filed on May 2, 2022. (ECF No. #53 .) The Court held a conference call on May 5, 2022 to discuss the Motion. Upon due consideration and finding it appropriate to do so, the Court GRANTS the Motion in Part. The Court CONTINUES the trial date to August 9, 2022. All discovery shall be completed no later than June 5, 2022. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed no later than June 9, 2022. In all other respects, this Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order entered on December 2, 2021 (ECF No. 28-1), shall remain in effect as adjusted based on the new trial date. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 5/5/2022. (jpow, )
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Bench Trial reset for 8/9/2022 at 9:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Telephone Conference held on 5/5/2022 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE by Courthouse News Service of Joint Stipulation of Facts (Carr, Dabney)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Memorandum in Support re #53 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Courthouse News Service. (Carr, Dabney)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carr, Dabney)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV on behalf of Courthouse News Service (Carr, Dabney)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint by Jacqueline C. Smith.(Altmiller, John)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint by Karl R. Hade.(McEntee, Robert)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER (Resolving Defendants' Motions to Dismiss) - THIS MATTER is before the Court on Defendant Karl Hade's ("Defendant Hade") Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 22, 24) and Defendant Jacqueline Smith's (collectively "Defendants") Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 26). For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, Defendant Hade's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 22) is DENIED. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 24, 26) are GRANTED IN PART. Specifically, the Court GRANTS the Motions to Dismiss as to Count Three of the Amended Complaint. In all other respects, Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 24, 26) are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/14/2022. (smej, )
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION (Resolving Defendants' Motions to Dismiss). Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/14/2022. (smej, )
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Letter to Court regarding General Assembly. (Blaemire, Jessica)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on January 10, 2022, before Judge Henry E. Hudson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Krista Liscio Harding, Telephone number 804 916-2296. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/11/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/12/2022.(liscio, krista)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER: Bench Trial set for 7/19/2022 at 9:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/10/2022) (rpiz)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Court Reporter Harding, OCR): Matter came on for Motions Hearing and Initial Pretrial Conference on 1/10/2022. Motion Hearing held re #22 Motion to Dismiss filed by Karl R. Hade, #24 Motion to Dismiss filed by Karl R. Hade, and #26 Motion to Dismiss filed by Jacqueline C. Smith. Argument heard. Motions taken under advisement by the Court; Memorandum Opinion to enter. Initial Pretrial Conference held; bench trial set for July 19, 2022 at 9:00 AM. Motions for summary judgment to be filed at least 70 days prior to trial; proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law due 14 days before trial. (rpiz)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER (Granting Motion to Withdraw) - THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiffs Motion to Withdraw as counsel for Courthouse News Service (ECF No. #41 ). It appearing good cause is shown, the Motion is GRANTED. Adam L. Shaw is RELIEVED as counsel of record in this matter. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 1/6/2022. (jpow, )
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Adam L. Shaw) by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaw, Adam)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica R Blaemire on behalf of Courthouse News Service (Blaemire, Jessica)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings as to #26 Motion to Dismiss, #24 Motion to Dismiss, and #22 Motion to Dismiss: Motion Hearing reset for 1/10/2022 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson;Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 1/10/2022 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (to immediately follow motions hearing) (rpiz)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jacqueline C. Smith. (Altmiller, John)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Karl R. Hade. (McEntee, Robert)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER (Granting Motion to Withdraw) - THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw as counsel for Courthouse News Service (ECF No. #34 ). It appearing good cause is shown, the Motion is GRANTED. Heather S. Goldman is RELIEVED as counsel of record in this matter. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/19/2021. (jpow, )
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Heather Goldman by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaw, Adam)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Hearings as to #26 Motion to Dismiss, #24 Motion to Dismiss, and #22 Motion to Dismiss: Motions Hearing set for 12/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson;Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 12/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (to immediately follow motions hearing) (rpiz)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Memorandum in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William Girdner, #2 Exhibit 1 to Girdner Declaration, #3 Affidavit of Jonathan Ginsberg, #4 Exhibit A to Ginsberg Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Ginsberg Declaration)(Shaw, Adam)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER (Granting Motion to Reschedule Initial Pretrial Conference; Setting Hearing on Motions to Dismiss; and Denying as Moot Motions to Dismiss) - THIS MATTER is before the Court on the parties' Joint Motion to Reschedule Initial Pretrial Conference (ECF No. #31 ) which is set for December 2, 2021. upon due consideration, the Motion is GRANTED. The Initial Pretrial Conference is RESCHEDULED to December 21, 2021. In addition, the Court will hear argument on Defendants Karl R. Hade and Jacqueline C. Smith's Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 22, 24, 26) on December 21, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The Initial Pretrial Conference will immediately follow the motion hearing. It appearing appropriate to do so, Defendant Hade's Motions (ECF Nos. #13 , #16 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. See order for details. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/16/2021. (jpow, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension to Reschedule Initial Pretrial Conference by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaw, Adam)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Jonathan Ginsberg to appear as Pro Hac Vice for Courthouse News Service. Signed by Senior United States District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/5/2021. (sbea)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan E. Ginsberg and Certification of Local Counsel Adam L. Shaw Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8086297. by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - J. Ginsberg Bar and Court Admissions)(Shaw, Adam)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Order issued by deputy clerk at the direction of the Court) (rpiz)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Memorandum in Support re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Jacqueline C. Smith. (Altmiller, John) Modified docket text on 10/14/2021 (jpow, ).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Jacqueline C. Smith. (Altmiller, John) Modified docket text on 10/14/2021 (jpow, ).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Memorandum in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Karl R. Hade. (McEntee, Robert) Modified docket text on 10/14/2021 (jpow, ).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Karl R. Hade. (McEntee, Robert) Modified docket text on 10/14/2021 (jpow, ).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Karl R. Hade. (McEntee, Robert) Modified docket text on 10/14/2021 (jpow, ).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) by Karl R. Hade. (McEntee, Robert) Modified docket text on 10/14/2021 (jpow, ).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction: Exhibits 1 and 4 in ECF #21 are incorrectly saved PDF fillable forms. The Clerk's Office has replaced exhibits 1 and 4 as nonfillable forms. The filing attorney is notified to correctly save the PDF fillable form, click on the File menu select Print, and then select your PDF writer from the Printer Name List, then click on Print or OK. No further action is required. (jpow, )
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Karl R. Hade, Jacqueline C. Smith, filed by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Shaw, Adam) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/15/2021) (jpow, ). (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/15/2021) (jpow, ).
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re: implementation of a briefing schedule regarding the filing of anAmended Complaint and anticipated motions to dismiss that Amended Complaint #19 - Based upon the agreement of the parties and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that: Plaintiff shall file its Amended Complaint on or before 9/14/2021; Defendants shall file their Answers or Motions to Dismiss on or before 10/12/2021; Any Opposition papers shall be filed on or before 11/16/2021; and Any Reply papers shall be filed on or before 11/30/2021. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 8/18/2021. (jpow, )
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension - Implementation of Briefing Schedule by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaw, Adam)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Rose McNeill on behalf of Karl R. Hade (McNeill, Erin)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Karl R. Hade. (McEntee, Robert)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Karl R. Hade. (McEntee, Robert)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - Having considered the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED #10 ; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or respond by no later than August 27, 2021. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 8/10/2021. (jpow, )
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Karl R. Hade. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McEntee, Robert)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Karl R. Hade. (McEntee, Robert)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B McEntee, III on behalf of Karl R. Hade (McEntee, Robert)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather R. Steele on behalf of Jacqueline C. Smith (Steele, Heather)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Defendant Jacqueline Smith to Answer or Respond to Complaint by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shaw, Adam)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Connell Altmiller, Jr on behalf of Jacqueline C. Smith (Altmiller, John)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction: Document numbers #7 and #8 were filed using the wrong docket event. For future filings the filing attorney should use the event "Summons Returned Executed." Clerk has corrected docket and set answer deadlines. (jpow, )
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed, Courthouse News Service's Rule 7.1 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement, Complaint with Exhibits and Civil Cover Sheet served on Jacqueline C. Smith on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021, filed by Courthouse News Service. (Shaw, Adam) Modified on 8/4/2021 (jpow, ).
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed, Courthouse News Service's Rule 7.1 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement, Complaint with Exhibits and Civil Cover Sheet served on Karl R. Hade on 7/20/2021, answer due 8/10/2021, filed by Courthouse News Service. (Shaw, Adam) Modified on 8/4/2021 (jpow, ).
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice Heather S. Goldman for plaintiff, Courthouse News Services. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 7/16/2021. (jpow, )
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Heather S. Goldman and Certification of Local Counsel Adam L. Shaw Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7893616. by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shaw, Adam)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Karl R. Hade and Jacqueline C. Smith. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jpow, )
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Courthouse News Service. (Shaw, Adam)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Defendants by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Shaw, Adam)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Courthouse News Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shaw, Adam) (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/15/2021) (jpow, ).
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (jpow, )
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Electronic Fee Payment - by Courthouse News Service. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7893397.. (Shaw, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Courthouse News Service v. Hade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courthouse News Service
Represented By: Adam Lee Shaw
Represented By: Heather Goldman
Represented By: Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV
Represented By: Jessica R Blaemire
Represented By: Jonathan Eric Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl R. Hade
Represented By: Erin Rose McNeill
Represented By: Robert B McEntee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline C. Smith
Represented By: John Connell Altmiller, Jr.
Represented By: Heather R. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Robert B McEntee, III
Represented By: Erin Rose McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?