Thomas v. Maximus, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sharey Thomas, Jennifer Gilvin, Laura Vick, Shannon Garner, Nyeshia Young, Olga Ramirez, Additional Consenting Joined Plaintiffs, Jennifer Salcido, Jimnelly Salcedo and Brenda Fowler
Defendant: Maximus, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00498
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: David J Novak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Memorandum in Support re #69 MOTION Equitable Tolling filed by Additional Consenting Joined Plaintiffs, Brenda Fowler, Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Jimnelly Salcedo, Jennifer Salcido, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Antell, Zev)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION Equitable Tolling by Additional Consenting Joined Plaintiffs, Brenda Fowler, Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Jimnelly Salcedo, Jennifer Salcido, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Antell, Zev)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Memorandum in Support re #67 MOTION to Amend Order to Provide for Certification of an Interlocutory Appeal (Opposed) filed by Maximus, Inc.. (DeCamp, Paul)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Amend Order to Provide for Certification of an Interlocutory Appeal (Opposed) by Maximus, Inc.. (DeCamp, Paul)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Memorandum in Support re #65 MOTION for Partial Reconsideration (Opposed) filed by Maximus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary of Evidence, #2 Exhibit 1 - Deposition transcript of Named Plaintiff Sharey Thomas, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Sharey Thomas, #4 Exhibit 3 - Deposition transcript of Named Plaintiff Laura Vick, #5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Laura Vick, #6 Exhibit 5 - Verified Interrogatory Responses of Laura Vick, #7 Exhibit 6 - Deposition transcript of Named Plaintiff Shannon Garner, #8 Exhibit 7 - Deposition transcript of Named Plaintiff Jimnelly Salcedo, #9 Exhibit 8 - Deposition transcript of Opt-In Plaintiff Carlos Medina, Jr., #10 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Carlos Medina, Jr., #11 Exhibit 10 - Verified Interrogatory Responses of Carlos Medina, Jr., #12 Exhibit 11 - Deposition transcript of Opt-In Plaintiff Terrany Thomas, #13 Exhibit 12 - Deposition transcript of Opt-In Plaintiff Daryl Pride, #14 Exhibit 13 - Continued deposition transcript of Daryl Pride, #15 Exhibit 14 - Verified Interrogatory Responses of Daryl Pride, #16 Exhibit 15 - Deposition transcript of Opt-In Fatisha Blanding, #17 Exhibit 16 - Declaration of Fatisha Blanding, #18 Exhibit 17 - Verified Interrogatory Responses of Fatisha Blanding, #19 Exhibit 18 - Deposition transcript of Opt-In Plaintiff Jakia Green, #20 Exhibit 19 - Verified Interrogatory Responses of Jakia Green, #21 Exhibit 20 - Declaration of Cowanda Reed, #22 Exhibit 21 - Declaration of Don Freeman, #23 Exhibit 22 - Declaration of Brenda Fowler, #24 Exhibit 23 - Declaration of Shakiera Butler, #25 Exhibit 24 - Declaration of Jennifer Salcido, #26 Exhibit 25 - Declaration of Nyeshia Young, #27 Exhibit 26 - Declaration of Jennifer Gilvin, #28 Exhibit 27 - Declaration of Jimnelly Salcedo, #29 Exhibit 28 - Verified Interrogatory Responses of Jessica Powell, #30 Exhibit 29 - Deposition transcript of David L. Kern, #31 Exhibit 30 - Deposition transcript of Randall G. ONeal, #32 Exhibit 31 - Expert Witness Report of Robert W. Crandall, #33 Exhibit 32 - Supplemental Report of Robert W. Crandall)(DeCamp, Paul)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for Partial Reconsideration (Opposed) by Maximus, Inc.. (DeCamp, Paul)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #28 Motion to Certify Class and Notice and Ordering Further Briefing- SEE ORDER FOR ALL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 2/28/2022. (cgar)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OPINION (Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion for Conditional Certification and Notice and Ordering Further Briefing). Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 2/28/2022. (cgar)
February 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on February 25, 2022, before Judge David J. Novak, Court Reporter/Transcriber Tracy Stroh, Telephone number 804-916-2278. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 3/29/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/29/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/30/2022.(stroh, tracy)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order On-The-Record Status Conference set for 2/25/2022 at 02:30 PM in Richmond Telephonically before District Judge David J. Novak. (cgar)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Lauren Elizabeth Braddy for Brenda Fowler, Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Jimnelly Salcedo, Jennifer Salcido, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 2/23/2022. (asho, )
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Elizabeth Braddy and Certification of Local Counsel Zev Antell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8259019. by Brenda Fowler, Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Jimnelly Salcedo, Jennifer Salcido, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young. (Antell, Zev)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #57 Motion for Pro hac vice retained Christopher Page for Maximus, Inc. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 2/22/2022. (jpow, )
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Page and Certification of Local Counsel Paul DeCamp Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8251224. by Maximus, Inc.. (DeCamp, Paul)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: #50 MOTION for Protective Order by Maximus, Inc. (See Stipulated Protective Order for Details). Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 2/7/2022. (asho, )
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Jill Bigler for Maximus, Inc.. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 2/4/2022. (asho, )
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jill Bigler and Certification of Local Counsel Paul DeCamp Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8225950. by Maximus, Inc.. (DeCamp, Paul)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Sherelle Wu for Maximus, Inc.. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 1/25/2022. (asho, )
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sherelle Wu and Certification of Local Counsel Paul DeCamp Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8208131. by Maximus, Inc.. (DeCamp, Paul)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE by Maximus, Inc. Joint Remote Video Deposition Protocol (DeCamp, Paul)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated) by Maximus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order)(DeCamp, Paul)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on January 7, 2022, before Judge David J. Novak, Court Reporter/Transcriber Tracy Stroh, Telephone number 804-916-2278. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/14/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2022.(stroh, tracy)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on December 6, 2021, before Judge David J. Novak,Court Reporter/Transcriber Tracy Stroh, Telephone number 804-916-2278. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/14/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2022.(stroh, tracy) (Main Document 48 replaced on 1/18/2022 at the request of court reporter) (tjoh, ).
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Brenda Fowler, Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Jimnelly Salcedo, Jennifer Salcido, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Carlos Medina, Jr.)(Antell, Zev)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION Regarding Depositions and Written Discovery (Joint) by Maximus, Inc.. (DeCamp, Paul)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER (Denying Request for Stay of Discovery) This matter comes before the Court following the parties' on the record status call with the Court on January 7, 2022. During the status call, Plaintiffs requested that the Court stay discovery until the Court issues its decision on their Opposed Motion for Conditional Certification and Notice to Putative Class Members (ECF No. 28). For the reasons stated during the status call, the Court hereby DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs' request on the merits. The Court advises Plaintiffs that they should assume that the Court will not reopen discovery after it rules on the Motion for Conditional Certification, and the parties should proceed with full merits discovery as scheduled at this point. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 1/8/2022. (asho, )
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Letter Submitting Proposed Discovery Schedule (Joint). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Schedule)(DeCamp, Paul)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge David J. Novak:On-The-Record Status Hearing held on 1/7/2022. (Court Reporter Tracy Stroh, OCR.)(cgar)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Francesco A. DeLuca for Maximus, Inc.. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 1/4/2022. (asho, )
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Francesco A. DeLuca and Certification of Local Counsel Paul DeCamp Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8176927. by Maximus, Inc.. (DeCamp, Paul)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Class Certification Hearing set for 3/2/2022 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6300 before District Judge David J. Novak. (cgar)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING ORDER - (SEE ORDER FOR ALL DETAILS AND DEADLINES) - Motion Hearing SET RE: MOTION to Certify Class #28 Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Conditional Certification and Notice to Putative Class Members for 3/2/2022 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6300 before District Judge David J. Novak. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 12/17/2021. (cgar)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order On-The-Record Status Call set for 12/16/2021 at 11:00 AM in Richmond Telephonically before District Judge David J. Novak. (cgar)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Brenda Fowler, Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Jimnelly Salcedo, Jennifer Salcido, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Nancy Arredondo, #2 Exhibit Consent of Ashley Barton, #3 Exhibit Consent of Samantha Cain, #4 Exhibit Consent of Vanessa Cotton, #5 Exhibit Consent of KaDeidra Ducre, #6 Exhibit Consent of Kierra Gill, #7 Exhibit Consent of Ellis Hill, Jr., #8 Exhibit Consent of Trichelle King, #9 Exhibit Consent of Jordan Lott, #10 Exhibit Consent of Brianna Parks, #11 Exhibit Consent of Briana Pruitt, #12 Exhibit Consent of Brenda Qualls, #13 Exhibit Consent of Kristina Williams, #14 Exhibit Consent of Martha Williams)(Antell, Zev)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Reply to Motion re #28 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Conditional Certification and Notice to Putative Class Members filed by Brenda Fowler, Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Jimnelly Salcedo, Jennifer Salcido, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young. (Antell, Zev)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Memorandum in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Conditional Certification and Notice to Putative Class Members filed by Maximus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron McNeese, #2 Declaration of Almeta McNear, #3 Declaration of Amy Barnes, #4 Declaration of Amy Leatherman, #5 Declaration of Angelica Villescas, #6 Declaration of Anthony Castillo, #7 Declaration of Anthony White, #8 Declaration of Ashley Leon, #9 Declaration of Boguslawa Diaz, #10 Declaration of Brian Milman, #11 Declaration of Briseida Dominguez Luna, #12 Declaration of Cameron Spencer, #13 Declaration of Carlos Medina Jr, #14 Declaration of Cassandra Sims, #15 Declaration of Cassondra Harden, #16 Declaration of Cheryl Miles, #17 Declaration of Cindy Molina, #18 Declaration of Cynthia Herrera, #19 Declaration of Dana Granger, #20 Declaration of Danyell Taylor-Sanderson, #21 Declaration of Eric Dalley, #22 Declaration of Gladys Johnson, #23 Declaration of Greg Teang, #24 Declaration of Iyashia Jarrett, #25 Declaration of Jacqueline Lucky, #26 Declaration of Jahi Algeciras, #27 Declaration of Janet Ragsdale, #28 Declaration of Jessica Landeros, #29 Declaration of Jessica Mendoza, #30 Declaration of Johneen Jarratt, #31 Declaration of Julissa Valor, #32 Declaration of Kalel Ramot Edwards, #33 Declaration of Karen Fisher, #34 Declaration of Krystal Garcia, #35 Declaration of Larisa Villarreal, #36 Declaration of Marcus McGeisey, #37 Declaration of Maria Paz, #38 Declaration of Maria Peguero, #39 Declaration of Marissa Ibarra, #40 Declaration of Mayra Jasso, #41 Declaration of Meshellie Boddie, #42 Declaration of Michelle Tyree, #43 Declaration of Monchel Duckett, #44 Declaration of Monserrat Villalobos Valenzuela, #45 Declaration of Nicole Ezell, #46 Declaration of Octavia Bearden, #47 Declaration of Omary Minier, #48 Declaration of Oscar Cuadra, #49 Declaration of Paula Workman, #50 Declaration of Raymond Saucier, #51 Declaration of Rex Borgman, #52 Declaration of Sandra Espinoza, #53 Declaration of Sasha Cousins, #54 Declaration of Sheena Andrew-Barry, #55 Declaration of Sheila Christensen, #56 Declaration of Sherri Wigington, #57 Declaration of Stephanie McClary, #58 Declaration of Susan Lumpkin, #59 Declaration of Tonja Chisolm, #60 Declaration of Valerie Shackleford, #61 Declaration of Valerie White, #62 Declaration of Vanetta A. Siples, #63 Declaration of Vincent Tyre, #64 Declaration of Yareli Ramirez, #65 Declaration of Yesenia Moreno)(DeCamp, Paul)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Additional Consenting Joined Plaintiffs, Brenda Fowler, Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Jimnelly Salcedo, Jennifer Salcido, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Antell, Zev)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER (Granting Extension of Time) re #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Because the parties agree, and for good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion (ECF No. 33). Defendant shall have until November 24, 2021, to file its opposition to Plaintiffs' conditional certification, and Plaintiffs shall have until December 3, 2021, to file their reply to Defendant's Response. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 11/17/2021. (asho, )
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Brenda Fowler, Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Jimnelly Salcedo, Jennifer Salcido, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Ranishia Allen, #2 Exhibit Consent of Jailah Garner, #3 Exhibit Consent of Raneshia Harris, #4 Exhibit Consent of Latisha Lundy, #5 Exhibit Consent of Raul Marinez, Jr., #6 Exhibit Consent of Mignonne Mondaoko, #7 Exhibit Consent of Chelsey Neuman, #8 Exhibit Consent of Ki Smith)(Antell, Zev)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint by Maximus, Inc..(DeCamp, Paul)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Briefing Schedule by Maximus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeCamp, Paul)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Brenda Fowler, Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Jimnelly Salcedo, Jennifer Salcido, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Robynn Burse, #2 Exhibit Consent of Deborah Gay, #3 Exhibit Consent of Courtney Smallwood, #4 Exhibit Consent of Michelle Solis)(Antell, Zev)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Brenda Fowler, Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Jimnelly Salcedo, Jennifer Salcido, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Kiontranese Johnson, #2 Exhibit Consent of Amanda Moseley)(Antell, Zev)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Brenda Fowler, Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Jimnelly Salcedo, Jennifer Salcido, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Shanece Baker, #2 Exhibit Consent of Laqundra Craft, #3 Exhibit Consent of Laquandra Davis, #4 Exhibit Consent of Domique Hays, #5 Exhibit Consent of Andrew Marshall)(Antell, Zev)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Memorandum in Support re #28 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Conditional Certification and Notice to Putative Class Members filed by Brenda Fowler, Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Jimnelly Salcedo, Jennifer Salcido, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Ex 5, #6 Exhibit Ex 6, #7 Exhibit Ex 7, #8 Exhibit Ex 8, #9 Exhibit Ex 9, #10 Exhibit Ex 10, #11 Exhibit Ex 11, #12 Exhibit Ex 12, #13 Exhibit Ex 13, #14 Exhibit Ex 14)(Antell, Zev)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion for Conditional Certification and Notice to Putative Class Members by Brenda Fowler, Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Jimnelly Salcedo, Jennifer Salcido, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young. (Antell, Zev)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Brenda Fowler, Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Jimnelly Salcedo, Jennifer Salcido, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Denotra Clayton)(Antell, Zev)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs' First Amended Collective/Class Action Complaint against Maximus, Inc., filed by Laura Vick, Jennifer Gilvin, Shannon Garner, Sharey Thomas, Nyeshia Young, Jennifer Salcido, Jimnelly Salcedo, Brenda Fowler.(Antell, Zev)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Consent of Claudia Salas, #2 Consent of Maria Torres)(Antell, Zev)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Fatisha Blanding, #2 Exhibit Consent of Linda Carter, #3 Exhibit Consent of Sherry Collier, #4 Exhibit Consent of Brenda Fowler, #5 Exhibit Consent of Stephanie D. Miller, #6 Exhibit Consent of Esperanza Ortiz, #7 Exhibit Consent of Timothy Parker, #8 Exhibit Consent of Latotianna Redd, #9 Exhibit Consent of Karen Smith, #10 Exhibit Consent of Terrany Thomas, #11 Exhibit Consent of Lynn Marie Young)(Antell, Zev)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by Maximus, Inc..(DeCamp, Paul)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maximus, Inc.. (DeCamp, Paul)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Antell, Zev)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Patricia Baggett)(Antell, Zev)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Austin Winters Anderson for Shannon Garner, for Jennifer Gilvin, for Olga Ramirez, for Sharey Thomas, for Laura Vick, for Nyeshia Young. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 9/14/2021. (asho, )
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed William Clifton Alexander for Shannon Garner, for Jennifer Gilvin, for Olga Ramirez, for Sharey Thomas, for Laura Vick, for Nyeshia Young. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 9/7/2021. (asho, )
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Teshia Jones)(Antell, Zev)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Rebecca Baker, #2 Exhibit Consent of Wykeria Coleman, #3 Exhibit Consent of Falana Hare, #4 Exhibit Consent of Marneiqwa Johnson, #5 Exhibit Consent of Jalen Magee, #6 Exhibit Consent of Ashton Woodson)(Antell, Zev)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Austin Winters Anderson and Certification of Local Counsel Zev H. Antell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7975939. by Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young. (Antell, Zev)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Clifton Alexander and Certification of Local Counsel Zev H. Antell Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7974605. by Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young. (Antell, Zev)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Olga Ramirez, Sharey Thomas, Shannon Garner, Laura Vick, Jennifer Gilvin, Nyeshia Young. Maximus, Inc. waiver sent on 8/25/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Antell, Zev)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Michaela Cole, #2 Exhibit Consent of Nia Hood, #3 Exhibit Consent of Daryl Pride)(Antell, Zev)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Pamela Ferguson, #2 Exhibit Consent of Destiny Griffin, #3 Exhibit Consent of Shalonda Hinton, #4 Exhibit Consent of Kristal Luna, #5 Exhibit Consent of Keandra McCarty, #6 Exhibit Consent of Patricia Parker, #7 Exhibit Consent of Jessica Powell, #8 Exhibit Consent of ARoyalty Robertson, #9 Exhibit Consent of Jimnelly Salcedo, #10 Exhibit Consent of Jennifer Salcido, #11 Exhibit Consent of Bradford Stinson, #12 Exhibit Consent of Brianna Tillery, #13 Exhibit Consent of Lisa I. Tiscareno, #14 Exhibit Consent of Gregory Tisdale, #15 Exhibit Consent of Bionca Warren, #16 Exhibit Consent of Tashyra Warren, #17 Exhibit Consent of Melanie S. Westbrook, #18 Exhibit Consent of Qianna White, #19 Exhibit Consent of Mahagony Williams, #20 Exhibit Consent of Jennifer Wilmert, #21 Exhibit Consent of Demayah Woods Johnson)(Antell, Zev)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Kashanna Denham, #2 Exhibit Consent of Keyuna Harrington, #3 Exhibit Consent of Jasmine Harris, #4 Exhibit Consent of Nashunner Haynes, #5 Exhibit Consent of Carma T. Howze, #6 Exhibit Consent of Joyce Nicole Jackson, #7 Exhibit Consent of Hayley R. Jefcoat, #8 Exhibit Consent of Takimbra Knight, #9 Exhibit Consent of Kizzy Lewis, #10 Exhibit Consent of Lyndia Luna, #11 Exhibit Consent of Micole McCullon, #12 Exhibit Consent of Delisha McGowan, #13 Exhibit Consent of Kylia Murphy, #14 Exhibit Consent of Marcades Myers, #15 Exhibit Consent of Shanikqua Myers, #16 Exhibit Consent of Tiawanna Newell, #17 Exhibit Consent of Jade Newsome, #18 Exhibit Consent of Randy Newsome, #19 Exhibit Consent of Jasmine Parker, #20 Exhibit Consent of Raven Perkins, #21 Exhibit Consent of Tina Polk, #22 Exhibit Consent of Cowanda Reed, #23 Exhibit Consent of Karla Salinas, #24 Exhibit Consent of Anthony Smith, Jr., #25 Exhibit Consent of Patricia Story)(Antell, Zev)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Consent to Join Suit as a Party Plaintiff by Zev Hillel Antell on behalf of Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Rakajah Allen, #2 Exhibit Consent of Tiffany Banks, #3 Exhibit Consent of Tevin Belim, #4 Exhibit Consent of Brittany Bell, #5 Exhibit Consent of Jennifer Boggan, #6 Exhibit Consent of Mahagony Bourne, #7 Exhibit Consent of Anzette S. Bowens, #8 Exhibit Consent of Jo A. Boyce, #9 Exhibit Consent of Emily Brinegar, #10 Exhibit Consent of Christina Brock, #11 Exhibit Consent of John L. Brown, Jr., #12 Exhibit Consent of Shakiera Butler, #13 Exhibit Consent of Michelle Cooke, #14 Exhibit Consent of Barbara M. Davis, #15 Exhibit Consent of Deanna Deberry, #16 Exhibit Consent of Keisha Dehaney, #17 Exhibit Consent of Kristian Dillon, #18 Exhibit Consent of Jerricka Dobson, #19 Exhibit Consent of Abril Dominguez, #20 Exhibit Consent of Don Freeman, #21 Exhibit Consent of Karla Garcia, #22 Exhibit Consent of Marian Garner, #23 Exhibit Consent of Stephanie L. Gilfillan, #24 Exhibit Consent of Jakia Green, #25 Exhibit Consent of Byron Harper)(Antell, Zev)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Amardeep Kaur Bharj for Maximus, Inc.. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 8/12/2021. (asho, )
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Adriana S. Kosovych for Maximus, Inc. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 8/12/2021. (asho, )
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Amardeep Kaur Bharj and Certification of Local Counsel Paul DeCamp Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7937369. by Maximus, Inc.. (DeCamp, Paul)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Adriana S. Kosovych and Certification of Local Counsel Paul DeCamp Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7937355. by Maximus, Inc.. (DeCamp, Paul)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul DeCamp on behalf of Maximus, Inc. (DeCamp, Paul)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Maximus, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove Header, Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (asho, )
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Shannon Garner, Jennifer Gilvin, Olga Ramirez, Sharey Thomas, Laura Vick, Nyeshia Young. (Antell, Zev)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint Plaintiffs' Collective Class Action Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7919822.), filed by Olga Ramirez, Sharey Thomas, Shannon Garner, Laura Vick, Jennifer Gilvin, Nyeshia Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Consent of Sharey Thomas, #2 Exhibit Ex B Consent of Jennifer Gilvin, #3 Exhibit Ex C Consent of Laura Vick, #4 Exhibit Ex D Consent of Shannon Garner, #5 Exhibit Ex E Consent of Nyeshia Young, #6 Exhibit Ex F Consent of Olga Ramirez, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Antell, Zev)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Initial Case Assignment to District Judge David J. Novak. (asho, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Maximus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharey Thomas
Represented By: Zev Hillel Antell
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Represented By: Craig Juraj Curwood
Represented By: Harris Dewey Butler, III
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Braddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gilvin
Represented By: Zev Hillel Antell
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Represented By: Craig Juraj Curwood
Represented By: Harris Dewey Butler, III
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Braddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Vick
Represented By: Zev Hillel Antell
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Represented By: Craig Juraj Curwood
Represented By: Harris Dewey Butler, III
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Braddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Garner
Represented By: Zev Hillel Antell
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Represented By: Craig Juraj Curwood
Represented By: Harris Dewey Butler, III
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Braddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nyeshia Young
Represented By: Zev Hillel Antell
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Represented By: Craig Juraj Curwood
Represented By: Harris Dewey Butler, III
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Braddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Ramirez
Represented By: Zev Hillel Antell
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Represented By: Craig Juraj Curwood
Represented By: Harris Dewey Butler, III
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Additional Consenting Joined Plaintiffs
Represented By: Harris Dewey Butler, III
Represented By: Zev Hillel Antell
Represented By: Craig Juraj Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Salcido
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Braddy
Represented By: Zev Hillel Antell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimnelly Salcedo
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Braddy
Represented By: Zev Hillel Antell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Fowler
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Braddy
Represented By: Zev Hillel Antell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximus, Inc.
Represented By: Paul DeCamp
Represented By: Adriana S. Kosovych
Represented By: Amardeep Kaur Bharj
Represented By: Christopher Todd Page
Represented By: Francesco A. DeLuca
Represented By: Jill Bigler
Represented By: Sherelle Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?