Chien v. Robbins et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Chien
Defendant: Edward A. Robbins, Jr., Frederick G. Rockwell, III, Wendy Hughes and Karl S. Leonard
Case Number: 3:2021cv00501
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John A Gibney
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that the Motion is GRANTED and Madeline M. Gibson's appearance as counsel for Judge Robbins and Judge Rockwell is hereby withdrawn. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 9/30/2021. Order was electronically sent to the plaintiff. (sbea,)
September 29, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Edward A. Robbins, Jr, Frederick G. Rockwell, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Gibson Motion to Withdraw)(Gibson, Madeline)
September 27, 2021 Filing 33 Supplementary of Memorandum for Objections filed by Andrew Chien re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (sbea,)
September 27, 2021 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Wendy Hughes. (Adams, Rachel)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that the Court, therefore, DIRECTS Chien to file on or before October 15, 2021, a written statement addressing why the Court should allow him to file any case in this District pertaining to the above described matters or against Judge Robbins, the Judge Rockwell, Hughes, and Leonard without submitting the contemplated lawsuit to a judge of this District for prefiling review and authorization. Chien may also wish to address the following additional issues, which the Court will consider before determining the propriety of a prefiling injunction: 1) Chien's prior history of litigation; 2) Whether Chien had a good faith basis for pursuing the litigation, or simply intended to harass the defendants; 3) The burden on the Court and the parties resulting from Chiens filings; and 4) The adequacy of alternative sanctions. Accordingly, for the reasons set forth above, the Court ORDERS Chien to show cause as to why the Court should not issue a prefiling injunction imposing the restrictions discussed above. See Order for details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 9/24/2021. Order was electronically sent to plaintiff. (sbea,)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that the Court did not receive Chien's response until September 20. Because the plaintiff proceeds pro se, the Court excuses the untimeliness of his response, exercising its discretion pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b), and GRANTS his #29 motion. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 9/22/2021. Order was electronically sent to plaintiff. (sbea,)
September 21, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for Allowing Time Delay Filing Due to Mail Loss by Andrew Chien. (Attachment: #1 Envelope and Receipt). (sbea,)
September 21, 2021 Filing 28 (DUPLICATE) Report of Volunteer Waiver of Paper Service by Andrew Chien re: #25 Report of Volunteer Waiver of Paper Service. (Attachments: #1 Agreement of Saving Paper). (sbea,)
September 21, 2021 Filing 27 (DUPLICATE) Memorandum for Objections filed by Andrew Chien re: #24 Objections. (sbea,)
September 21, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Karl S. Leonard. (Etherington, William)
September 20, 2021 Filing 25 Report of Volunteer Waiver of Paper Service by Andrew Chien. (Attachments: #1 Agreement of Saving Paper). (sbea,)
September 20, 2021 Filing 24 Memorandum for Objections filed by Andrew Chien re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #10 Memorandum in Support, #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #15 Brief in Support, #17 MOTION Pre-Filing Injunction, #18 Brief in Support, #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and #22 Memorandum in Support. (sbea,)
August 30, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Elizabeth Hensley on behalf of Edward A. Robbins, Jr, Frederick G. Rockwell, III (Hensley, Amy)
August 26, 2021 Filing 22 Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro,. filed by Edward A. Robbins, Jr, Frederick G. Rockwell, III. (Gibson, Madeline)
August 26, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,., MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Roseboro,. by Edward A. Robbins, Jr, Frederick G. Rockwell, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gibson, Madeline)
August 26, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Markelz Gibson on behalf of Edward A. Robbins, Jr, Frederick G. Rockwell, III (Gibson, Madeline)
August 25, 2021 Filing 19 Roseboro Notice as to Motion for a Pre-Filing Injunction by Karl S. Leonard (Etherington, William)
August 25, 2021 Filing 18 Brief in Support to #17 MOTION Pre-Filing Injunction filed by Karl S. Leonard. (Etherington, William)
August 25, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION Pre-Filing Injunction by Karl S. Leonard. (Etherington, William)
August 25, 2021 Filing 16 Roseboro Notice as to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Karl S. Leonard (Etherington, William)
August 25, 2021 Filing 15 Brief in Support to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Karl S. Leonard. (Etherington, William)
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Karl S. Leonard. (Etherington, William)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by William Fisher Etherington on behalf of Karl S. Leonard (Etherington, William)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Neal Jamerson on behalf of Karl S. Leonard (Jamerson, Thomas)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Greer Quinlan Drummond on behalf of Karl S. Leonard (Drummond, Greer)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Wendy Hughes. (Adams, Rachel)
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Wendy Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Rachel)
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Willer Adams on behalf of Wendy Hughes (Adams, Rachel)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William Woodul Tunner on behalf of Wendy Hughes (Tunner, William)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Chien; Edward A. Robbins, Jr. served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021; and Frederick G. Rockwell, III served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (sbea,)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Chien; Wendy Hughes served on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021; and Karl S. Leonard served on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (sbea,)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that this matter comes before the Court on the plaintiff's #2 motion for electronic notice of all filings in this case. Upon due consideration, the Court GRANTS the motion and DIRECTS the Clerk to provide electronic notice to the plaintiff at jcs23@yahoo.com. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 8/5/2021. Order was electronically generated to plaintiff. (sbea,)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Edward A. Robbins, Jr., Frederick G. Rockwell, III, Wendy Hughes, and Karl S. Leonard. (Attachment: #1 Cover Letter). Clerk mailed prepared summonses in the U.S. Postal Service paid envelope to: Chesterfield Process Service, 10310 Beechgrove Drive, Chesterfield, VA 23832. (sbea,)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Andrew Chien. (sbea,)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Andrew Chien against Edward A. Robbins, Jr. Frederick G. Rockwell, III, Wendy Hughes, and Karl S. Leonard, (Filing Fee: $402.00, Receipt Number: 34683051108). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Receipt). (sbea,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chien v. Robbins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Chien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward A. Robbins, Jr.
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Hensley
Represented By: Madeline Markelz Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick G. Rockwell, III
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Hensley
Represented By: Madeline Markelz Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Hughes
Represented By: William Woodul Tunner
Represented By: Rachel Willer Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl S. Leonard
Represented By: Greer Quinlan Drummond
Represented By: Thomas Neal Jamerson
Represented By: William Fisher Etherington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?