Clary v. Meherrin River Regional Jail Authority
Plaintiff: Makayla J. Clary
Defendant: Meherrin River Regional Jail Authority
Case Number: 3:2021cv00506
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) - The Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 15) is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This case is CLOSED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/28/2021. (smej, )
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Meherrin River Regional Jail Authority. (Anderson, Matthew)
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Makayla J. Clary. (Columbus, Rocco)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER (Directing Plaintiff to File a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) - The Court hereby DIRECTS Plaintiff to file a response brief to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss within seven (7) days of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court warns Plaintiff that this case may be dismissed. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/16/2021. (smej, )
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Meherrin River Regional Jail Authority.(Anderson, Matthew)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2021 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Order issued by deputy clerk at the direction of the Court) (rpiz)
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Meherrin River Regional Jail Authority. (Anderson, Matthew)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Meherrin River Regional Jail Authority. (Anderson, Matthew)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Traynham Anderson on behalf of Meherrin River Regional Jail Authority (Anderson, Matthew)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rocco Philip Thomas Columbus on behalf of Makayla J. Clary (Columbus, Rocco) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/17/2021) (smej, ).
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 Letter mailed to plaintiff's counsel with a copy of Local Rule 83.1. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1) (smej, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Meherrin River Regional Jail Authority. (Anderson, Matthew)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal (Filing Fee: $402.00, Receipt Number: AVAEDC-7931633), filed by Meherrin River Regional Jail Authority. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Anderson, Matthew)
August 6, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (smej, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clary v. Meherrin River Regional Jail Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makayla J. Clary
Represented By: Rocco Philip Thomas Columbus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meherrin River Regional Jail Authority
Represented By: Matthew Traynham Anderson
Represented By: William Woodul Tunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?