Sklepovich v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Dawn A Sklepovich
Defendant: Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Group Incorporated and Cook Medical, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00543
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Henry E Hudson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-59) (adun, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-166) - 15 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in ALN/2:21-cv-01174, 1 in FLS/0:21-cv-61787, 1 in GAS/1:21-cv-00129, 1 in KYW/3:21-cv-00529, 1 in LAM/3:21-cv-00501, 1 in MD/1:21-cv-02011, 1035 in MDL No. 2570, 1 in MIE/2:21-cv-11906, 1 in MIE/2:21-cv-12029, 1 in MSN/1:21-cv-00138, 1 in NYW/6:21-cv-06593, 1 in OKN/4:21-cv-00366, 1 in PAM/4:21-cv-01524, 1 in SC/2:21-cv-02810, 1 in VAE/3:21-cv-00543, 1 in WVS/3:21-cv-00437) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/30/2021. (adun, )
September 30, 2021 ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-166) Finalized on 9/30/21. Please see pleading (3 in ALN/2:21-cv-01174, 3 in FLS/0:21-cv-61787, 3 in GAS/1:21-cv-00129, 3 in KYW/3:21-cv-00529, 3 in LAM/3:21-cv-00501, 3 in MD/1:21-cv-02011, 1042 in MDL No. 2570, 3 in MIE/2:21-cv-11906, 3 in MIE/2:21-cv-12029, 3 in MSN/1:21-cv-00138, 3 in NYW/6:21-cv-06593, 3 in OKN/4:21-cv-00366, 3 in PAM/4:21-cv-01524, 3 in SC/2:21-cv-02810, 3 in VAE/3:21-cv-00543, 3 in WVS/3:21-cv-00437).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the S.D. Indiana for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/30/2021. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2570, ALN/2:21-cv-01174, FLS/0:21-cv-61787, GAS/1:21-cv-00129, KYW/3:21-cv-00529, LAM/3:21-cv-00501, MD/1:21-cv-02011, MIE/2:21-cv-11906, MIE/2:21-cv-12029, MSN/1:21-cv-00138, NYW/6:21-cv-06593, OKN/4:21-cv-00366, PAM/4:21-cv-01524, SC/2:21-cv-02810, VAE/3:21-cv-00543, WVS/3:21-cv-00437 (JC) (adun, )
September 30, 2021 Case electronically transferred to District of Southern District of Indiana. (adun, )
September 30, 2021 Remark- DETAILS: Case transferred from Virginia Eastern has been opened in SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA as case 1:21-cv-06619, filed 9/30/21. (adun, )
September 3, 2021 Notice of Correction re #7 , #8 , #9 , and #10 . Filing attorney notified for future filings, proper filing event is Summons Returned Executed. Returns should include copy of issued summons. Clerk has corrected documents, docket events, and set answer deadline for all defendants. (jsmi, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Cook Medical LLC served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (DellaFera, Thomas) (Main Document 10 replaced and answer deadline set on 9/3/2021) (jsmi, ).
September 2, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Cook Medical Incorporated served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (DellaFera, Thomas) (Main Document 9 replaced and answer deadline set on 9/3/2021) (jsmi, ).
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Cook Incorporated served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (DellaFera, Thomas) (Main Document 8 replaced and answer deadline set on 9/3/2021) (jsmi, ).
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Cook Group Incorporated served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (DellaFera, Thomas) (Main Document 7 replaced and answer deadline set on 9/3/2021) (jsmi, ).
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, and Cook Medical, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons to Cook Medical LLC by Dawn A Sklepovich. (DellaFera, Thomas) (Clerk replaced main document with non-fillable form on 8/18/2021) (jsmi, ).
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Cook Group Incorporated by Dawn A Sklepovich. (DellaFera, Thomas) (Clerk replaced main document with non-fillable form on 8/18/2021) (jsmi, ).
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Cook Medical Incorporated by Dawn A Sklepovich. (DellaFera, Thomas) (Clerk replaced main document with non-fillable form on 8/18/2021) (jsmi, ).
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Cook Incorporated by Dawn A Sklepovich. (DellaFera, Thomas) (Clerk replaced main document with non-fillable form on 8/18/2021) (jsmi, ).
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7950463.), filed by Dawn A Sklepovich. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DellaFera, Thomas) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/18/2021) (jsmi, ).
August 18, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (jsmi, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sklepovich v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn A Sklepovich
Represented By: Thomas Francis DellaFera, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?